Roe 1 et al v. Allina Health System et al
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, John Doe 16, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, John Doe 17, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158 and John Doe 30
Defendant: Allina Health System, Affiliated Community Medical Centers, Ltd., Carris Health - Redwood, LLC, Group Health Plan, Inc., Children's Health Care, ESSENTIA HEALTH, St. Mary's Duluth Clinic Health System, CentraCare Health System, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, Gillette Childrens Specialty Health Care, SMDC Medical Center, Regions Hospital, University of Minnesota Physicians, Mayo Clinic, North Memorial Health Care, Park Nicollet Methodist Hospital, St. Luke's Hospital of Duluth, Minneapolis Radiation Oncology, P.A., Lakeview Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Xavier Becerra, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Rochelle P Walensky, CENTER FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION and CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES
Case Number: 0:2021cv02127
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 136 NOTICE THAT NO REDACTION IS REQUIRED by Allina Health System re #132 Transcript. Attn: Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Chambers, Terran)
November 3, 2021 Filing 135 NOTICE THAT NO REDACTION IS REQUIRED by Group Health Plan, Inc., Lakeview Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Park Nicollet Methodist Hospital, Regions Hospital re #132 Transcript. Attn: Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Wilk, David)
November 3, 2021 Filing 134 NOTICE THAT NO REDACTION IS REQUIRED by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network re #132 Transcript. Attn: Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Dixon, Joseph)
November 3, 2021 Filing 133 NOTICE THAT NO REDACTION IS REQUIRED by North Memorial Health Care re #132 Transcript. Attn: Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Dougherty, Rachel)
October 27, 2021 Filing 132 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 10/12/2021 before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (107 pages). Court Reporter: Erin Drost. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 11/3/2021. Redaction Request due 11/17/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2022. (EDD)
October 19, 2021 Filing 131 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Mohrman, William)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER on #124 Stipulation to Extend Time to Amend Complaint and for Defendants to Respond. Plaintiffs shall have until October 22, 2021 to either amend or voluntarily dismiss the complaint. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/18/2021.(LNP)
October 15, 2021 Filing 129 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #112 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Kvinge, John)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #62 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Katie Ervin Carlson for Carris Health - Redwood, LLC, CentraCare Health System, and for Mayo Clinic. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/15/2021. (NAH)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #126 Letter to District Judge. Plaintiffs may have until October 19, 2021 to disclose the named plaintiffs to the Defendant employers. Ordered by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 10/15/2021. (KMW)
October 14, 2021 Filing 126 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99 . (Erickson, Gregory)
October 14, 2021 Filing 125 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #124 Stipulation,. (Dixon, Joseph)
October 14, 2021 Filing 124 STIPULATION re #2 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, to Extend Time to Amend Complaint and for Defendants to Respond by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network. Jointly Signed by All Plaintiffs and All Defendants. (Dixon, Joseph)
October 14, 2021 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B Brantingham on behalf of Affiliated Community Medical Centers, Ltd., Carris Health - Redwood, LLC, CentraCare Health System, Mayo Clinic. (Brantingham, Andrew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 14-Day Transcript of #112 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Dougherty, Rachel)
October 13, 2021 Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #112 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Chambers, Terran)
October 13, 2021 Filing 120 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 14-Day Transcript of #112 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Whitmore, Mark)
October 13, 2021 Filing 119 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 14-Day Transcript of #112 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Wilk, David)
October 13, 2021 Filing 118 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 102, John Doe 13, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 131, John Doe 20, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 65, John Doe 14, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 29, John Doe 7, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 120, John Doe 2, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 63, John Doe 4, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 14, John Doe 29, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 96, John Doe 11, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 24, John Doe 23, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 114, John Doe 26, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 81, John Doe 17, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 47, John Doe 21, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 33, John Doe 5, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 103, John Doe 16, John Doe 25, Mary Roe 59, John Doe 24, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 61, John Doe 27, John Doe 3, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 99, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 135, John Doe 30, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 64, John Doe 19, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 39, John Doe 6, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 52, John Doe 18, Mary Roe 56, John Doe 8, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 54, John Doe 12, John Doe 10, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 40, John Doe 1, John Doe 22, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 36, John Doe 15, John Doe 28, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 154. Xavier Becerra, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Rochelle P Walensky, Center for Disease Control and Prevention, Centers For Medicare & Medicaid Services served on 9/29/2021, answer due 11/29/2021.(Erickson, Gregory) Modified text on 10/18/2021 (MTP).
October 13, 2021 Filing 117 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 102, John Doe 13, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 131, John Doe 20, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 65, John Doe 14, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 29, John Doe 7, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 120, John Doe 2, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 63, John Doe 4, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 14, John Doe 29, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 96, John Doe 11, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 24, John Doe 23, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 114, John Doe 26, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 81, John Doe 17, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 47, John Doe 21, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 33, John Doe 5, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 103, John Doe 16, John Doe 25, Mary Roe 59, John Doe 24, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 61, John Doe 27, John Doe 3, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 99, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 135, John Doe 30, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 64, John Doe 19, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 39, John Doe 6, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 52, John Doe 18, Mary Roe 56, John Doe 8, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 54, John Doe 12, John Doe 10, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 40, John Doe 1, John Doe 22, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 36, John Doe 15, John Doe 28, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 154. Group Health Plan, Inc., Fairview Health Services, Gillette Childrens Specialty Health Care Served on 9/28/2021, Answer Due 10/19/2021; Lakeview Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Allina health System, Fairview Physician Associates Network, Regions Hospital, Mayo Clinic, North Memorial Health Care, Park Nicollet Methodist Hospital, Minneapolis Radiation Oncology, P.A., St. Marys Duluth Clinic Health System, SMDC Medical Center, Essentia Health Served on 9/29/2021, Answer Due 10/20/2021; University of Minnesota Physicians, St. Lukes Hospital of Duluth Served on 9/30/2021, Answer Due 10/21/2021; CentraCare Health System, Affiliated Community Medical Centers, Ltd., Carris Health-Redwood, LLC, Childrens Health Care Served on 10/1/2021, Answer Due 10/22/2021. (Erickson, Gregory) Modified text on 10/19/2021 (MTP).
October 13, 2021 Filing 116 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #112 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Brantingham, Andrew)
October 13, 2021 Filing 115 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #112 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (McNee, Emily)
October 13, 2021 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Dougherty on behalf of North Memorial Health Care. (Dougherty, Rachel)
October 13, 2021 Filing 113 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 14-Day Transcript of #112 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Voss, Ana)
October 12, 2021 Filing 112 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy E. Brasel: Motion Hearing held on 10/12/2021 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS. The motion was moved, argued and denied. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Erin Drost) (KMW)
October 12, 2021 Filing 111 EXHIBIT 1 re #80 Declaration in Opposition, filed by Allina Health System.(Chambers, Terran)
October 12, 2021 Filing 110 Declaration of Mary Roe 155 in Support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99.(Erickson, Gregory)
October 11, 2021 Filing 109 REPLY re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99.(Mohrman, William)
October 11, 2021 Filing 108 Declaration of Mary Roe 114 in Support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99.(Erickson, Gregory)
October 11, 2021 Filing 107 Declaration of Mary Roe 79 in Support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99.(Erickson, Gregory)
October 11, 2021 Filing 106 Declaration of Mary Roe 68 in Support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99.(Erickson, Gregory)
October 11, 2021 Filing 105 Declaration of Mary Roe 61 in Support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99.(Erickson, Gregory)
October 11, 2021 Filing 104 Declaration of Mary Roe 58 in Support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99.(Erickson, Gregory)
October 11, 2021 Filing 103 Declaration of Mary Roe 16 in Support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99.(Erickson, Gregory)
October 11, 2021 Filing 102 Declaration of John Doe 30 in Support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99.(Erickson, Gregory)
October 11, 2021 Filing 101 Declaration of John Doe 29 in Support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99.(Erickson, Gregory)
October 11, 2021 Filing 100 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99 . (Erickson, Gregory)
October 10, 2021 Filing 99 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. INSTRUCTED TO REFILE: SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 102, John Doe 13, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 131, John Doe 20, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 65, John Doe 14, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 29, John Doe 7, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 120, John Doe 2, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 63, John Doe 4, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 14, John Doe 29, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 96, John Doe 11, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 24, John Doe 23, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 114, John Doe 26, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 81, John Doe 17, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 47, John Doe 21, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 33, John Doe 5, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 103, John Doe 16, John Doe 25, Mary Roe 59, John Doe 24, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 61, John Doe 27, John Doe 3, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 99, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 135, John Doe 30, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 64, John Doe 19, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 39, John Doe 6, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 52, John Doe 18, Mary Roe 56, John Doe 8, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 54, John Doe 12, John Doe 10, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 40, John Doe 1, John Doe 22, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 36, John Doe 15, John Doe 28, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 154. Affiliated Community Medical Centers, Ltd. served on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021; Allina Health System served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021; Xavier Becerra served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021; Carris Health - Redwood, LLC served on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021; Center for Disease Control and Prevention served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021; Centers For Medicare & Medicaid Services served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021; CentraCare Health System served on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021; Children's Health Care served on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021; Essentia Health served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021; Fairview Health Services served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021; Fairview Physician Associates Network served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021; Gillette Childrens Specialty Health Care served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021; Group Health Plan, Inc. served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021; Lakeview Memorial Hospital Association, Inc. served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021; Mayo Clinic served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021; Minneapolis Radiation Oncology, P.A. served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021; North Memorial Health Care served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021; Park Nicollet Methodist Hospital served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021; Regions Hospital served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021; SMDC Medical Center served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021; St. Luke's Hospital of Duluth served on 9/30/1931, answer due 10/21/1931; St. Mary's Duluth Clinic Health System served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021; United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021; University of Minnesota Physicians served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021; Rochelle P Walensky served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021. (Erickson, Gregory) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (MTP).
October 8, 2021 Filing 98 EXHIBIT W re #85 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, North Memorial Health Care.(Huyser, Alethea)
October 8, 2021 Filing 97 EXHIBIT V re #85 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, North Memorial Health Care.(Huyser, Alethea)
October 8, 2021 Filing 96 EXHIBIT U re #85 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, North Memorial Health Care.(Huyser, Alethea)
October 8, 2021 Filing 95 EXHIBIT T re #85 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, North Memorial Health Care.(Huyser, Alethea)
October 8, 2021 Filing 94 EXHIBIT S re #85 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, North Memorial Health Care.(Huyser, Alethea)
October 8, 2021 Filing 93 EXHIBIT R re #85 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, North Memorial Health Care.(Huyser, Alethea)
October 8, 2021 Filing 92 EXHIBIT Q re #85 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, North Memorial Health Care.(Huyser, Alethea)
October 8, 2021 Filing 91 EXHIBIT P re #85 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, North Memorial Health Care.(Huyser, Alethea)
October 8, 2021 Filing 90 EXHIBIT O re #85 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, North Memorial Health Care.(Huyser, Alethea)
October 8, 2021 Filing 89 EXHIBIT N re #85 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, North Memorial Health Care.(Huyser, Alethea)
October 8, 2021 Filing 88 EXHIBIT M re #85 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, North Memorial Health Care.(Huyser, Alethea)
October 8, 2021 Filing 87 EXHIBIT L re #85 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, North Memorial Health Care.(Huyser, Alethea)
October 8, 2021 Filing 86 EXHIBIT K re #85 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, North Memorial Health Care.(Huyser, Alethea)
October 8, 2021 Filing 85 DECLARATION of Pari McGarraugh in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, North Memorial Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J)(Huyser, Alethea)
October 8, 2021 Filing 84 DECLARATION of Becky Rauen in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, North Memorial Health Care.(Huyser, Alethea)
October 8, 2021 Filing 83 DECLARATION of Kara Tomlinson, M.D. in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, North Memorial Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Huyser, Alethea)
October 8, 2021 Filing 82 DECLARATION of Kim Drennan in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Allina Health System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - COVID 19 Immunization Program, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - COVID Employment Policy)(Ricchiuto, Anne)
October 8, 2021 Filing 81 DECLARATION of Gregory Johnson in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, North Memorial Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Huyser, Alethea)
October 8, 2021 Filing 80 DECLARATION of Terran C. Chambers in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Allina Health System. (Attachments: #1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. WILL REFILE. Exhibit(s) 1 - Allina Plaintiffs' Chart)(Ricchiuto, Anne) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (CLK). Modified text on 10/12/2021 (CLK).
October 8, 2021 Filing 79 BRIEF re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, North Memorial Health Care. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Huyser, Alethea)
October 8, 2021 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Allina Health System. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ricchiuto, Anne)
October 8, 2021 Filing 77 DECLARATION of Elizabeth A. Patton in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Gillette Childrens Specialty Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Patton, Elizabeth)
October 8, 2021 Filing 76 DECLARATION of Michelle Lemahieu in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Gillette Childrens Specialty Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3)(Patton, Elizabeth)
October 8, 2021 Filing 75 DECLARATION of R. Nickolas Nyhus, MA, SPHR, SHRM-SCP by University of Minnesota Physicians . (Whitmore, Mark)
October 8, 2021 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Gillette Childrens Specialty Health Care. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Patton, Elizabeth)
October 8, 2021 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by University of Minnesota Physicians. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Whitmore, Mark)
October 8, 2021 Filing 72 DECLARATION of Tobi Tanzer in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Group Health Plan, Inc., Lakeview Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Park Nicollet Methodist Hospital, Regions Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Wilk, David)
October 8, 2021 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Group Health Plan, Inc., Lakeview Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Park Nicollet Methodist Hospital, Regions Hospital. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wilk, David)
October 8, 2021 Filing 70 DECLARATION of Marla Halvorson in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Essentia Health, SMDC Medical Center, St. Luke's Hospital of Duluth, St. Mary's Duluth Clinic Health System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Mrkonich, Marko)
October 8, 2021 Filing 69 DECLARATION of Patricia Pfoser in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Minneapolis Radiation Oncology, P.A..(Ballintine, Daniel)
October 8, 2021 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Emily A. McNee in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Essentia Health, SMDC Medical Center, St. Luke's Hospital of Duluth, St. Mary's Duluth Clinic Health System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-2)(Mrkonich, Marko)
October 8, 2021 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Minneapolis Radiation Oncology, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ballintine, Daniel)
October 8, 2021 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Essentia Health, SMDC Medical Center, St. Luke's Hospital of Duluth, St. Mary's Duluth Clinic Health System. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mrkonich, Marko)
October 8, 2021 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Christopher Tommaso in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Carris Health - Redwood, LLC, CentraCare Health System, Mayo Clinic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Brantingham, Andrew)
October 8, 2021 Filing 64 DECLARATION of George Morris, M.D. in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Carris Health - Redwood, LLC, CentraCare Health System, Mayo Clinic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Brantingham, Andrew)
October 8, 2021 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Carris Health - Redwood, LLC, CentraCare Health System, Mayo Clinic. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Brantingham, Andrew)
October 8, 2021 Filing 62 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katie Ervin Carlson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9072201 filed by Carris Health - Redwood, LLC, CentraCare Health System, Mayo Clinic. (Kornblatt, Jillian)
October 8, 2021 Filing 61 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Allina Health System. (Chambers, Terran)
October 8, 2021 Filing 60 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Mayo Clinic. (Brantingham, Andrew)
October 8, 2021 Filing 59 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant CentraCare Health System. (Brantingham, Andrew)
October 8, 2021 Filing 58 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Carris Health - Redwood, LLC. (Brantingham, Andrew)
October 7, 2021 Filing 57 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant St. Luke's Hospital of Duluth. (McNee, Emily)
October 7, 2021 Filing 56 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Essentia Health, SMDC Medical Center, St. Mary's Duluth Clinic Health System. (McNee, Emily)
October 7, 2021 Filing 55 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Xavier Becerra, Center for Disease Control and Prevention, Centers For Medicare & Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Rochelle P Walensky . (Tweeten, Andrew)
October 7, 2021 Filing 54 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant University of Minnesota Physicians. (Whitmore, Mark)
October 7, 2021 Filing 53 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Gillette Childrens Specialty Health Care. (Patton, Elizabeth)
October 7, 2021 Filing 52 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Minneapolis Radiation Oncology, P.A.. (Ballintine, Daniel)
October 6, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily A McNee on behalf of Essentia Health, SMDC Medical Center, St. Luke's Hospital of Duluth, St. Mary's Duluth Clinic Health System. (McNee, Emily)
October 6, 2021 Filing 50 (Text-Only) NOTICE: Remote Public Access to #46 Motion for TRO/Preliminary Injunction scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 1:30 PM.To join the telephonic hearing, dial 1-669-254-5252. Use access code 160 299 1388 and security code 066372623. (KMW)
October 6, 2021 Filing 49 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant North Memorial Health Care. (McGarraugh, Pari)
October 6, 2021 Filing 48 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Fairview Physician Associates Network. (Dixon, Joseph)
October 6, 2021 Filing 47 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Fairview Health Services. (Dixon, Joseph)
October 6, 2021 Filing 46 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2021 at 01:30 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Mohrman, William)
October 6, 2021 Filing 45 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Children's Health Care. (Dixon, Joseph)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Anne Ricchiuto for Allina Health System. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/6/2021. (NAH)
October 5, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Nic Puechner on behalf of Minneapolis Radiation Oncology, P.A.. (Puechner, Nic)
October 5, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2021 at 01:30 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Mohrman, William)
October 5, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J Wells on behalf of Carris Health - Redwood, LLC, CentraCare Health System, Mayo Clinic. (Wells, Steven)
October 5, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Bullard on behalf of Carris Health - Redwood, LLC, CentraCare Health System, Mayo Clinic. (Bullard, Nicholas)
October 5, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R Whitmore on behalf of University of Minnesota Physicians. (Whitmore, Mark)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS. The hearing on the Motion for TRO/Preliminary Injunction #3 is scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 1:30 PM by Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. Response briefs by defendants are due 10/8/21 by 5:00 p.m. and Reply briefs by plaintiffs are due 10/11/21 by 5:00 p.m. Ordered by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 10/5/2021.Notice to Public: Please visit our website at #https://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/court-schedules for audio connection information for this hearing. Note that hearings might not appear on the court schedule or courthouse kiosk until one week before the hearing date.(KMW)
October 5, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Ballintine on behalf of Minneapolis Radiation Oncology, P.A.. (Ballintine, Daniel)
October 5, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by John Anders Kvinge on behalf of Minneapolis Radiation Oncology, P.A.. (Kvinge, John)
October 5, 2021 Filing 35 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Alethea M Huyser on behalf of Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network. (Huyser, Alethea) Modified text on 10/5/2021 (MTP).
October 5, 2021 Filing 34 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph T Dixon, III on behalf of Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network. (Dixon, Joseph) Modified text on 10/5/2021 (MTP).
October 4, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily A McNee on behalf of Essentia Health. (McNee, Emily)
October 4, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Marko J Mrkonich on behalf of Essentia Health. (Mrkonich, Marko)
October 4, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Alethea M Huyser on behalf of Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services. (Huyser, Alethea)
October 4, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph T Dixon, III on behalf of Children's Health Care, Fairview Health Services. (Dixon, Joseph)
October 1, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian Kornblatt on behalf of Carris Health - Redwood, LLC, CentraCare Health System, Mayo Clinic. (Kornblatt, Jillian)
October 1, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B Brantingham on behalf of Carris Health - Redwood, LLC, CentraCare Health System, Mayo Clinic. (Brantingham, Andrew)
October 1, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Pari McGarraugh on behalf of North Memorial Health Care. (McGarraugh, Pari)
October 1, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenny Helling Fuller on behalf of Gillette Childrens Specialty Health Care. (Fuller, Jenny)
October 1, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A Patton on behalf of Gillette Childrens Specialty Health Care. (Patton, Elizabeth)
October 1, 2021 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Group Health Plan, Inc., Lakeview Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Park Nicollet Methodist Hospital, Regions Hospital. (Wilk, David)
October 1, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anne K. Ricchiuto. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9056411 filed by Allina Health System. (Chambers, Terran)
October 1, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Terran C. Chambers on behalf of Allina Health System. (Chambers, Terran)
October 1, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Liles Harvey Repp on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Center for Disease Control and Prevention, Centers For Medicare & Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Rochelle P Walensky. (Repp, Liles)
October 1, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Tweeten on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Center for Disease Control and Prevention, Centers For Medicare & Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Rochelle P Walensky. (Tweeten, Andrew)
October 1, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana H Voss on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Center for Disease Control and Prevention, Centers For Medicare & Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Rochelle P Walensky. (Voss, Ana)
September 30, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Wilk on behalf of Group Health Plan, Inc., Lakeview Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Park Nicollet Methodist Hospital, Regions Hospital. (Wilk, David)
September 29, 2021 Filing 17 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
September 28, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Xavier Becerra, Center for Disease Control and Prevention, Centers For Medicare & Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Rochelle P Walensky. (CLK)
September 28, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Gillette Childrens Specialty Health Care, Lakeview Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Mayo Clinic, Minneapolis Radiation Oncology, P.A., North Memorial Health Care, Park Nicollet Methodist Hospital, Regions Hospital, SMDC Medical Center, St. Luke's Hospital of Duluth, University of Minnesota Physicians. (CLK)
September 28, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Affiliated Community Medical Centers, Ltd., Allina Health System, Carris Health - Redwood, LLC, CentraCare Health System, Children's Health Care, Essentia Health, Fairview Health Services, Fairview Physician Associates Network, Group Health Plan, Inc., St. Mary's Duluth Clinic Health System. (CLK)
September 28, 2021 Filing 13 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-cv-2127 NEB/HB. (CLK)
September 27, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER #3 Motion for TRO,,,,,,,,,,. (Erickson, Gregory)
September 27, 2021 Filing 11 Declaration of Vincent J. Fahnlander in Support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M, #14 Exhibit(s) N, #15 Exhibit(s) O)(Erickson, Gregory)
September 27, 2021 Filing 10 Declaration of Mary Roe 122 in Support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99.(Erickson, Gregory)
September 27, 2021 Filing 9 Declaration of Mary Roe 110 in Support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99.(Erickson, Gregory)
September 27, 2021 Filing 8 Declaration of Mary Roe 72 in Support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99.(Erickson, Gregory)
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 Declaration of Mary Roe 13 in Support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99.(Erickson, Gregory)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 Declaration of John Doe 1 in Support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99.(Erickson, Gregory)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Erickson, Gregory)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested : Date and time to be determined. (Erickson, Gregory)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 3, John Doe 30, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 102, Mary Roe 103, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 114, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 120, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 131, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 135, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 14, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 154, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 24, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 29, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 33, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 36, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 39, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 40, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 47, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 52, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 54, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 59, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 61, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 63, Mary Roe 64, Mary Roe 65, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 81, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 96, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 99. (Erickson, Gregory)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief - Jury Trial Demanded (corrected) against All Defendants. filed by Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 102, John Doe 13, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 131, John Doe 20, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 65, John Doe 14, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 29, John Doe 7, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 120, John Doe 2, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 63, John Doe 4, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 14, John Doe 29, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 96, John Doe 11, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 24, John Doe 23, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 114, John Doe 26, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 81, John Doe 17, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 47, John Doe 21, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 33, John Doe 5, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 103, John Doe 16, John Doe 25, Mary Roe 59, John Doe 24, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 61, John Doe 27, John Doe 3, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 99, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 135, John Doe 30, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 64, John Doe 19, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 39, John Doe 6, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 52, John Doe 18, Mary Roe 56, John Doe 8, Mary Roe 45, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 54, John Doe 12, John Doe 10, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 40, John Doe 1, John Doe 22, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 36, John Doe 15, John Doe 28, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 154. Filer requests summons issued. (Erickson, Gregory)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief - Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9045767) filed by Mary Roe 32, Mary Roe 110, Mary Roe 77, Mary Roe 102, John Doe 13, Mary Roe 86, Mary Roe 18, Mary Roe 109, Mary Roe 16, Mary Roe 44, Mary Roe 55, Mary Roe 71, Mary Roe 27, Mary Roe 144, Mary Roe 80, Mary Roe 57, Mary Roe 20, Mary Roe 93, Mary Roe 146, Mary Roe 76, Mary Roe 134, Mary Roe 131, John Doe 20, Mary Roe 31, Mary Roe 35, Mary Roe 11, Mary Roe 65, John Doe 14, Mary Roe 90, Mary Roe 140, Mary Roe 29, John Doe 7, Mary Roe 121, Mary Roe 98, Mary Roe 58, Mary Roe 15, Mary Roe 136, Mary Roe 68, Mary Roe 120, John Doe 2, Mary Roe 85, Mary Roe 60, Mary Roe 73, Mary Roe 63, John Doe 4, John Doe 9, Mary Roe 148, Mary Roe 122, Mary Roe 112, Mary Roe 2, Mary Roe 17, Mary Roe 157, Mary Roe 94, Mary Roe 69, Mary Roe 130, Mary Roe 151, Mary Roe 14, John Doe 29, Mary Roe 118, Mary Roe 96, John Doe 11, Mary Roe 155, Mary Roe 128, Mary Roe 49, Mary Roe 24, John Doe 23, Mary Roe 158, Mary Roe 123, Mary Roe 88, Mary Roe 108, Mary Roe 114, John Doe 26, Mary Roe 66, Mary Roe 105, Mary Roe 137, Mary Roe 23, Mary Roe 81, John Doe 17, Mary Roe 142, Mary Roe 143, Mary Roe 47, John Doe 21, Mary Roe 8, Mary Roe 83, Mary Roe 37, Mary Roe 43, Mary Roe 101, Mary Roe 5, Mary Roe 153, Mary Roe 33, John Doe 5, Mary Roe 21, Mary Roe 7, Mary Roe 67, Mary Roe 26, Mary Roe 103, John Doe 16, John Doe 25, Mary Roe 59, John Doe 24, Mary Roe 145, Mary Roe 61, John Doe 27, John Doe 3, Mary Roe 92, Mary Roe 99, Mary Roe 79, Mary Roe 87, Mary Roe 10, Mary Roe 97, Mary Roe 135, John Doe 30, Mary Roe 125, Mary Roe 78, Mary Roe 150, Mary Roe 91, Mary Roe 48, Mary Roe 74, Mary Roe 64, John Doe 19, Mary Roe 116, Mary Roe 107, Mary Roe 132, Mary Roe 50, Mary Roe 39, John Doe 6, Mary Roe 82, Mary Roe 12, Mary Roe 41, Mary Roe 52, John Doe 18, Mary Roe 56, Mary Roe 45, John Doe 8, Mary Roe 19, Mary Roe 54, John Doe 12, John Doe 10, Mary Roe 159, Mary Roe 1, Mary Roe 149, Mary Roe 75, Mary Roe 119, Mary Roe 100, Mary Roe 127, Mary Roe 124, Mary Roe 30, Mary Roe 84, Mary Roe 111, Mary Roe 25, Mary Roe 104, Mary Roe 28, Mary Roe 70, Mary Roe 62, Mary Roe 117, Mary Roe 139, Mary Roe 40, John Doe 1, John Doe 22, Mary Roe 133, Mary Roe 113, Mary Roe 138, Mary Roe 53, Mary Roe 106, Mary Roe 126, Mary Roe 141, Mary Roe 22, Mary Roe 42, Mary Roe 46, Mary Roe 13, Mary Roe 89, Mary Roe 6, Mary Roe 72, Mary Roe 156, Mary Roe 3, Mary Roe 36, John Doe 15, John Doe 28, Mary Roe 95, Mary Roe 9, Mary Roe 51, Mary Roe 129, Mary Roe 38, Mary Roe 4, Mary Roe 34, Mary Roe 115, Mary Roe 147, Mary Roe 152, Mary Roe 154. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Erickson, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roe 1 et al v. Allina Health System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 1
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 2
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 3
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 4
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 5
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 6
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 7
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 8
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 9
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 10
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 11
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 12
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 13
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 14
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 15
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 16
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 17
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 18
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 19
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 20
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 21
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 22
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 23
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 24
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 25
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 26
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 27
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 28
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 29
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 30
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 31
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 32
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 33
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 34
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 35
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 36
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 37
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 38
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 39
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 40
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 41
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 42
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 43
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 44
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 45
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 46
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 47
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 48
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 49
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 50
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 51
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 52
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 53
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 54
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 55
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 56
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 57
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 58
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 1
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 2
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 3
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 4
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 5
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 6
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 7
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 8
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 9
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 10
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 11
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 12
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 13
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 59
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 60
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 61
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 62
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 63
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 64
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 65
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 66
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 67
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 68
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 69
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 70
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 71
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 72
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 73
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 74
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 75
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 76
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 77
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 78
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 79
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 14
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 15
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 80
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 81
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 82
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 83
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 16
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 84
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 85
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 86
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 87
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 88
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 89
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 90
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 91
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 92
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 93
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 94
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 95
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 96
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 97
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 98
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 99
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 100
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 101
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 102
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 103
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 104
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 105
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 106
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 107
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 108
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 109
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 17
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 110
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 111
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 112
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 113
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 114
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 115
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 116
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 117
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 118
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 119
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 120
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 121
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 122
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 123
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 124
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 125
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 126
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 127
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 128
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 129
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 130
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 131
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 132
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 133
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 134
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 135
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 136
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 137
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 138
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 139
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 140
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 141
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 142
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 143
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 144
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 145
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 146
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 147
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 148
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 149
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 150
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 151
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 152
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 153
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 154
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 155
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 18
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 19
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 20
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 21
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 22
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 23
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 24
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 25
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 26
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 27
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 28
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 29
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 156
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 157
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roe 158
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 30
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Vincent J Fahnlander
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allina Health System
Represented By: Anne Ricchiuto
Represented By: Terran C. Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affiliated Community Medical Centers, Ltd.
Represented By: Andrew B Brantingham
Represented By: Jillian Kornblatt
Represented By: Katie Ervin Carlson
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Steven J Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carris Health - Redwood, LLC
Represented By: Andrew B Brantingham
Represented By: Jillian Kornblatt
Represented By: Katie Ervin Carlson
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Steven J Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: David M Wilk
Represented By: Taylor R McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Children's Health Care
Represented By: Joseph T Dixon, III
Represented By: Alethea M Huyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESSENTIA HEALTH
Represented By: Emily A McNee
Represented By: Marko J Mrkonich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Mary's Duluth Clinic Health System
Represented By: Emily A McNee
Represented By: Marko J Mrkonich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CentraCare Health System
Represented By: Andrew B Brantingham
Represented By: Jillian Kornblatt
Represented By: Katie Ervin Carlson
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Steven J Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairview Health Services
Represented By: Alethea M Huyser
Represented By: Joseph T Dixon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairview Physician Associates Network
Represented By: Alethea M Huyser
Represented By: Joseph T Dixon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gillette Childrens Specialty Health Care
Represented By: Elizabeth A Patton
Represented By: Jenny Helling Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMDC Medical Center
Represented By: Emily A McNee
Represented By: Marko J Mrkonich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Hospital
Represented By: David M Wilk
Represented By: Taylor R McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Minnesota Physicians
Represented By: Jonathan P Norrie
Represented By: Mark R Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayo Clinic
Represented By: Andrew B Brantingham
Represented By: Jillian Kornblatt
Represented By: Katie Ervin Carlson
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Steven J Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Memorial Health Care
Represented By: Rachel Dougherty
Represented By: Pari McGarraugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Nicollet Methodist Hospital
Represented By: David M Wilk
Represented By: Taylor R McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Luke's Hospital of Duluth
Represented By: Emily A McNee
Represented By: Marko J Mrkonich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minneapolis Radiation Oncology, P.A.
Represented By: Daniel J Ballintine
Represented By: John Anders Kvinge
Represented By: Nic Puechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Memorial Hospital Association, Inc.
Represented By: David M Wilk
Represented By: Taylor R McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Represented By: Liles Harvey Repp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Represented By: Liles Harvey Repp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochelle P Walensky
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Represented By: Liles Harvey Repp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTER FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Represented By: Liles Harvey Repp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Represented By: Liles Harvey Repp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?