Hartmann et al v. Schauer et al
Plaintiff: Michael Otto Hartmann and Diane Hartmann
Defendant: David E. Schauer, County of Sibley and Possible John/Jane Does
Case Number: 0:2021cv02146
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by County of Sibley, David E. Schauer re #17 Reply, #21 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #20 Meet and Confer Statement, #19 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #22 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #18 MOTION Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant , #23 Proposed Order to Judge (Bayliss, Kenneth)
November 24, 2021 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #18 MOTION Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant filed by County of Sibley, David E. Schauer.(Bayliss, Kenneth)
November 24, 2021 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Ryan Paukert in SUPPORT OF #18 MOTION Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant filed by County of Sibley, David E. Schauer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D)(Bayliss, Kenneth)
November 24, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant filed by County of Sibley, David E. Schauer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bayliss, Kenneth)
November 24, 2021 Filing 20 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #18 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by County of Sibley, David E. Schauer.(Bayliss, Kenneth)
November 24, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #18 MOTION Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant : Date and time to be determined. (Bayliss, Kenneth)
November 24, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant filed by County of Sibley, David E. Schauer. (Bayliss, Kenneth)
November 24, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by County of Sibley, David E. Schauer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bayliss, Kenneth)
November 10, 2021 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Diane Hartmann, Michael Otto Hartmann.(MTP)
November 10, 2021 Filing 15 EXHIBIT List re #14 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Diane Hartmann, Michael Otto Hartmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(MTP)
November 10, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Diane Hartmann, Michael Otto Hartmann.(MTP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/11/2021: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate) (MTP).
November 10, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #14 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion: LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate added. (MTP)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Due to the pending Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #6 ), the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. The Court will schedule a pretrial conference, if needed, promptly after a decision is issued on the pending motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/22/2021.(LNP)
October 21, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by County of Sibley, David E. Schauer re #10 Meet and Confer Statement, #11 Proposed Order to Judge re Findings of Fact/Conclusions of Law, #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #7 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #9 Declaration in Support, #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Bayliss, Kenneth)
October 21, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE RE FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW . (Bayliss, Kenneth)
October 21, 2021 Filing 10 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #6 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by County of Sibley, David E. Schauer.(Bayliss, Kenneth)
October 21, 2021 Filing 9 Declaration of Kenneth H. Bayliss in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by County of Sibley, David E. Schauer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C, #2 Exhibit(s) D-F, #3 Exhibit(s) G-I)(Bayliss, Kenneth)
October 21, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by County of Sibley, David E. Schauer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bayliss, Kenneth)
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Bayliss, Kenneth)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by County of Sibley, David E. Schauer. (Bayliss, Kenneth)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Otto Hartmann, Diane Hartmann. County of Sibley served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. (MTP) Document QC'd on 11/4/2021 (MTP).
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Otto Hartmann, Diane Hartmann. David E. Schauer served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. (MTP) Document QC'd on 11/4/2021 (MTP).
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Sibley, Possible John/Jane Does, David E. Schauer (filing fee $402, receipt number 4-1112008) filed by Michael Otto Hartmann, Diane Hartmann. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) List, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartmann et al v. Schauer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Otto Hartmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Hartmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E. Schauer
Represented By: Kenneth H Bayliss, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sibley
Represented By: Kenneth H Bayliss, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Possible John/Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?