McHugh v. Bank of New York Mellon, et al
Plaintiff: Thomas M. McHugh
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon, Bank of New York, The, Bank of America, N.A., Servicer, Auction.com, John Doe and Mary Roe
Case Number: 0:2021cv02174
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas M. McHugh re #23 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(KNK)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE filed by Thomas M. Mchugh. (KNK)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition with Word Count Certification re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Thomas M. McHugh.(KNK) Modified text on 12/2/2021 (KNK).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #14 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bank of America, N.A., Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Seiler, Quin)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY regarding Dispositive Motions briefing schedule: All dispositive motions must comply with Local Rule 7.1(c). Responses to dispositive motions shall be filed with the Court on or before 21 days after the service of the supporting memorandum to the original motion. Replies to responsive briefs shall be filed 14 days after the service of the response to the dispositive motion. Upon the motion being fully briefed and filed, counsel for the moving party shall email Chief Judge Tunheims chambers at Tunheim_Chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov to request a hearing date. Upon receiving from Chief Judge Tunheims Courtroom Deputy a hearing date, time and location, the moving party shall file the amended notice of hearing at that time. (HMA)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Bank of America, N.A., Bank of New York Mellon re #17 Proposed Order to Judge, #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #15 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #16 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #18 Certificate of Service on Proposed Order (Seiler, Quin)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Bank of America, N.A., Bank of New York Mellon re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Seiler, Quin)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bank of America, N.A., Bank of New York Mellon.(Seiler, Quin)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bank of America, N.A., Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Seiler, Quin)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Date and time to be determined. (Seiler, Quin)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bank of America, N.A., Bank of New York Mellon. (Seiler, Quin)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Servicer, Auction.com (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kaluza, Kristina)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Bank of America, N.A., Bank of New York Mellon re #11 Notice of Appearance (Seiler, Quin)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Quin C. Seiler on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., Bank of New York Mellon. (Seiler, Quin)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Schroeder, Mark)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/13/2021. (TJB)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Bank of America, N.A., Bank of New York Mellon re #6 Stipulation, #7 Proposed Order to Judge (Schroeder, Mark)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Schroeder, Mark)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Bank of America, N.A., Bank of New York Mellon. (Schroeder, Mark)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd/4th Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 21-cv-02174 JRT/DTS. (MTP)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EXHIBIT B - Auction.com's Consent to Removal re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Bank of America, N.A., Bank of New York Mellon(Schroeder, Mark) Modified text on 10/4/2021 (MTP).
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Bank of New York Mellon. (Schroeder, Mark) Modified text on 10/4/2021 (MTP).
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County, Minnesota, case number 82-cv-21-3588 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9060190) filed by Bank of America, N.A., Bank of New York Mellon (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Summons, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schroeder, Mark) Modified text on 10/4/2021 (MTP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McHugh v. Bank of New York Mellon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Kathryn Babb
Represented By: Mark G Schroeder
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York, The
Represented By: Kathryn Babb
Represented By: Mark G Schroeder
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Kathryn Babb
Represented By: Mark G Schroeder
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servicer, Auction.com
Represented By: Kristina Kaluza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas M. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?