Humphrey v. Johnson Controls, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Humphrey
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc. and Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP
Case Number: 0:2021cv02187
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12111
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Humphrey. Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP served on 10/14/2021, answer due 11/4/2021; Johnson Controls, Inc. served on 10/14/2021, answer due 11/4/2021. (Conners, Ryan)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP, Johnson Controls, Inc. (CLK)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-2187 SRN/ECW. (CLK)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9064459) filed by Aaron Humphrey. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Leland, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphrey v. Johnson Controls, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Humphrey
Represented By: Daniel Gray Leland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?