Lowry v. City of Minneapolis et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Lowry
Defendant: City of Minneapolis, Minneapolis Public Housing Authority and Community Housing Resources
Case Number: 0:2021cv02189
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Grossman in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Community Housing Resources, Minneapolis Public Housing Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits to Declaration of E. Grossman)(Kinney, Benjamin)
November 24, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Community Housing Resources, Minneapolis Public Housing Authority. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Certificate of Compliance, ( Attachments FILED IN ERROR, REFILED - See Doc. No. #13 #2 Exhibit(s) Declaration of E. Grossman, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibits to Declaration of E. Grossman)(Kinney, Benjamin) Modified text on 11/24/2021 (KNK).
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kimberly Lowry.(Prakash, Anna)
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Kimberly Lowry.(Prakash, Anna)
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 Declaration of Anna P. Prakash in Support of #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kimberly Lowry.(Prakash, Anna)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kimberly Lowry. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Prakash, Anna)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Prakash, Anna)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kimberly Lowry. (Prakash, Anna)
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by City of Minneapolis of Consent to Removal (Fussy, Tracey)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 10/12/2021.(CLG)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-2189 PJS/KMM. (MMG)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Minnesot, County of Hennepin, Fourth Judicial District, case number 27-cv-21-10928 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9064728) filed by Community Housing Resources, Minneapolis Public Housing Authority. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - State Court MPHA and CHR's Answer, #3 Exhibit(s) C - State Court City of Minneapolis Answer, #4 Exhibit(s) D - State Court Other Filings, #5 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jones, Suzanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowry v. City of Minneapolis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Lowry
Represented By: Anna P Prakash
Represented By: John R Shoemaker
Represented By: Lawrence Reed McDonough
Represented By: Nicole Jean Schladt
Represented By: Paul F Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Minneapolis
Represented By: Sharda R Enslin
Represented By: Tracey N Fussy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minneapolis Public Housing Authority
Represented By: Suzanne L Jones
Represented By: Benjamin Kinney
Represented By: Kenneth H Bayliss, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Housing Resources
Represented By: Suzanne L Jones
Represented By: Benjamin Kinney
Represented By: Kenneth H Bayliss, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?