Favors v. Commissioner of the Internal Revenue Service et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Anthony Favors
Defendant: Commissioner of the Internal Revenue Service and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 0:2021cv02267
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 38 LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from Joseph Anthony Favors. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK)
November 18, 2021 Filing 37 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the Internal Revenue Service, Internal Revenue Service. (CLK)
November 10, 2021 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Anthony Favors re #34 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #35 Proposed Order to Judge, #33 MOTION to Reconsider re #25 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(MKB) Document QC'd on 12/2/2021 (JME).
November 10, 2021 Filing 35 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #33 MOTION to Reconsider re #25 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings. filed by Joseph Anthony Favors.(MKB)Document QC'd on 12/2/2021 (JME).
November 10, 2021 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Support re #33 MOTION to Reconsider re #25 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(MKB) Document QC'd on 12/2/2021 (JME).
November 10, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION to Reconsider re #25 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. (MKB)
November 5, 2021 Filing 32 SEALED EXHIBIT re #27 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint,, filed by Joseph Anthony Favors.(MKB) Document QC'd on 11/18/2021 (CLK).
November 5, 2021 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Anthony Favors re #28 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #27 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint, #30 Proposed Order to Judge, #29 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(MKB) Document QC'd on 11/18/2021 (CLK).
November 5, 2021 Filing 30 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #27 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint, filed by Joseph Anthony Favors.(MKB) Document QC'd on 11/18/2021 (CLK).
November 5, 2021 Filing 29 SECOND NOTICE of Motion for Leave to File Supplement to the Complaint by Joseph Anthony Favors. (MKB) Document QC'd on 11/18/2021 (CLK).
November 5, 2021 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION for Leave to File Second Necessary Supplement #1 Complaint, filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(MKB) Document QC'd on 11/18/2021 (CLK).
November 5, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Supplement #1 Complaint, filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(MKB) Document QC'd on 11/18/2021 (CLK).
November 2, 2021 Filing 26 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Joseph Anthony Favors re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete cc: Joseph Anthony Favors. (kt)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #13 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs; denying #8 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings; and denying #3 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/2/2021. (Written Opinion) (EB)
October 27, 2021 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Anthony Favors re #21 Request, #23 Notice (Other), #22 Proposed Order to Judge (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 11/5/2021 (JME).
October 27, 2021 Filing 23 LETTER NOTICE OF FILING by Joseph Anthony Favors. (CLK) Document QC'd on 11/5/2021 (JME).
October 27, 2021 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Joseph Anthony Favors.(CLK) Document QC'd on 11/5/2021 (JME).
October 27, 2021 Filing 21 REQUEST re #15 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Joseph Anthony Favors.(CLK) Document QC'd on 11/5/2021 (JME).
October 14, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
October 14, 2021 Filing 14 (PREVIOUSLY FILED IN 0:21-mc-00060-ECT )LETTER from the Clerk's Office to Joseph Favors. cc: Favors with original documents. (kt)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (PREVIOUSLY FILED IN 0:21-mc-00060-ECT )Order Granting Authorization to Open New Proceeding. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 10/12/2021.(kt) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt). Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt).
October 12, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Anthony Favors re #15 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #16 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #17 Notice of Motion. (kt)
October 12, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Joseph Anthony Favors re #15 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (kt)
October 12, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(kt)
October 12, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(kt)
October 6, 2021 Filing 12 (PREVIOUSLY FILED IN 0:21-mc-00060-ECT )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Anthony Favors re #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #11 Exhibit, #8 MOTION for Leave to Supplement Complaint, #9 Notice of Motion. (kt) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt). Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt).
October 6, 2021 Filing 11 (PREVIOUSLY FILED IN 0:21-mc-00060-ECT )SEALED EXHIBIT re #8 MOTION for Leave to Supplement Complaint filed by Joseph Favors. (Attachments: #1 Confidential Information Sheet)(kt) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt). Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt).
October 6, 2021 Filing 10 (PREVIOUSLY FILED IN 0:21-mc-00060-ECT )MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION for Leave to Supplement Complaint filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(kt) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt). Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt).
October 6, 2021 Filing 9 (PREVIOUSLY FILED IN 0:21-mc-00060-ECT )NOTICE by Joseph Anthony Favors re #8 MOTION for Leave to Supplement Complaint. (kt) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt). Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt).
October 6, 2021 Filing 8 (PREVIOUSLY FILED IN 0:21-mc-00060-ECT ) MOTION for Leave to Supplement Complaint filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Supplemental Pleadings to Complaint, #2 Envelope)(kt) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt). Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt).
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 (PREVIOUSLY FILED IN 0:21-mc-00060-ECT )SEALED EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, by Joseph Favors. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(kt) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt). Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt).
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (PREVIOUSLY FILED IN 0:21-mc-00060-ECT )ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT: Plaintiff Joseph Anthony Favors shall submit the required financial document on or before October 7, 2021. See Order for additional specifics and details. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 9/8/2021.(kt) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt). Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt).
September 7, 2021 Filing 13 (PREVIOUSLY FILED IN 0:21-mc-00060-ECT ) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s))(kt) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt). Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt). Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt).
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 (PREVIOUSLY FILED IN 0:21-mc-00060-ECT )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Anthony Favors re #1 Complaint, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (kt) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt). Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt).
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 (PREVIOUSLY FILED IN 0:21-mc-00060-ECT )PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 MOTION FOR PROCEDURAL RELIEF filed by Joseph Anthony Favors.(kt) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt). Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt).
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 (PREVIOUSLY FILED IN 0:21-mc-00060-ECT )EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROCEDURAL RELIEF filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. (kt) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt). Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt).
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 (PREVIOUSLY FILED IN 0:21-mc-00060-ECT ) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of the Internal Revenue Service, Internal Revenue Service filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Tax List list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope, #5 Envelope) (kt) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt). Modified text on 10/14/2021 (kt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Favors v. Commissioner of the Internal Revenue Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Anthony Favors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?