Triangle Warehouse, Inc. et al v. City of Minneapolis et al
Plaintiff: Triangle Warehouse, Inc., Benchmark Logistics, LLC and Cue Properties, LLC
Defendant: City of Minneapolis and Hennepin County
Case Number: 0:2021cv02305
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 11/18/2021.(RMM)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: WILL REFILE ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 11/18/2021.(RMM) Modified text on 11/18/2021 (kt).
November 18, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Benchmark Logistics, LLC, Cue Properties, LLC, Triangle Warehouse, Inc. (Kostolnik, Matthew)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on #11 Stipulation. City of Minneapolis answer due 12/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 11/18/2021.(MSK)
November 17, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 Stipulation. (Enslin, Sharda)
November 17, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant City of Minneapolis to Respond to Complaint by City of Minneapolis. Jointly Signed by Triangle Warehouse, Inc., Benchmark Logistics, LLC, and Cue Properties, LLC. (Enslin, Sharda)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #8 Stipulation. Hennepin County answer due 12/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/29/2021.(MSK)
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Pierce, Kelly)
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant Hennepin County to Respond to Complaint by Hennepin County. Jointly Signed by Hennepin County, Triangle Warehouse Inc, and Cue Properties LLC. (Pierce, Kelly)
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christiana Martenson on behalf of Hennepin County. (Martenson, Christiana)
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Triangle Warehouse, Inc., Cue Properties, LLC, Benchmark Logistics, LLC. Hennepin County served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (Minster, Aaron)
October 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Triangle Warehouse, Inc., Cue Properties, LLC, Benchmark Logistics, LLC. City of Minneapolis served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (Minster, Aaron)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Minneapolis, Hennepin County. (MTP)
October 18, 2021 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd/4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 21-cv-02305 ECT/BRT. (MTP)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron P Minster on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Minster, Aaron)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9087730) filed by Triangle Warehouse, Inc., Cue Properties, LLC, Benchmark Logistics, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kostolnik, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triangle Warehouse, Inc. et al v. City of Minneapolis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triangle Warehouse, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron P Minster
Represented By: Matthew P Kostolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benchmark Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Aaron P Minster
Represented By: Matthew P Kostolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cue Properties, LLC
Represented By: Aaron P Minster
Represented By: Matthew P Kostolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Minneapolis
Represented By: Rebecca J. Krystosek
Represented By: Sharda R Enslin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennepin County
Represented By: Christiana Martenson
Represented By: Kelly K. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?