Aery v. Arhart
Plaintiff: James Paul Aery
Defendant: Joshua Arhart
Case Number: 0:2021cv02375
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Joshua Arhart, Official Capacity. (lmb)
December 20, 2021 Filing 9 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECTLY ISSUED-WILL REFILE. Summons Issued as to Joshua Arhart, Individual & Official Capacity. (lmb) Modified text on 12/20/2021 (lmb).
December 14, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Prison Authorities re: Filing Fee Due as to James Paul Aery, enclosing #6 Order on Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. cc: Prison Authorities, Beltrami County Jail (lmb)
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk's Office to James Paul Aery enclosing #6 Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete. cc: James Paul Aery. (lmb)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 12/13/2021. (JRS)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Joshua Arhart filed by James Paul Aery. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (kt)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Prison Authorities re: Filing Fee Due as to James Paul Aery, enclosing #3 Order. cc: Prison Authorities, Beltrami County Jail. (lmb)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 11/5/2021. (JRS)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by James Paul Aery. (NAH)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Joshua Arhart filed by James Paul Aery. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 6th/Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (NAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aery v. Arhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Paul Aery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Arhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?