Ng v. Board of Regents of the University of Minnesota et al
Plaintiff: Evan Ng
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of Minnesota, Mark Coyle and Joan T.A. Gable
Case Number: 0:2021cv02404
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
2 Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 31 Reply to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Evan Ng.(Trotter, Caleb)
December 3, 2021 Filing 30 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Board of Regents of the University of Minnesota, Mark Coyle, Joan T.A. Gable.(Benrud, Brent)
December 3, 2021 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Mark Coyle in Opposition to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Board of Regents of the University of Minnesota, Mark Coyle, Joan T.A. Gable. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Benrud, Brent)
December 3, 2021 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Marc Ryan in Opposition to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Board of Regents of the University of Minnesota, Mark Coyle, Joan T.A. Gable.(Benrud, Brent)
December 3, 2021 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Julie Manning in Opposition to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Board of Regents of the University of Minnesota, Mark Coyle, Joan T.A. Gable. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Benrud, Brent)
December 3, 2021 Filing 26 Reply to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Board of Regents of the University of Minnesota, Mark Coyle, Joan T.A. Gable. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Benrud, Brent)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER on #23 Stipulation. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is now due: 12/3/2021. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 11/15/2021. (SMD)
November 12, 2021 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #23 Stipulation. (Pramas, Timothy)
November 12, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Board of Regents of the University of Minnesota, Mark Coyle, Joan T.A. Gable. (Pramas, Timothy)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER on #19 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 11/10/2021.(MSK)
November 9, 2021 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #19 Stipulation. (Pramas, Timothy)
November 9, 2021 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #19 Stipulation. (Pramas, Timothy)
November 9, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Board of Regents of the University of Minnesota, Mark Coyle, Joan T.A. Gable. (Pramas, Timothy)
November 9, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2022 at 01:00 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Trotter, Caleb)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Nancy E. Brasel recused. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-2404 (SRN/BRT). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 11/9/2021.(MMP)
November 8, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Joseph Pramas on behalf of Board of Regents of the University of Minnesota, Mark Coyle, Joan T.A. Gable. (Pramas, Timothy)
November 8, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie Ryan Gallia on behalf of Board of Regents of the University of Minnesota, Mark Coyle, Joan T.A. Gable. (Ryan Gallia, Carrie)
November 8, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent P Benrud on behalf of Board of Regents of the University of Minnesota, Mark Coyle, Joan T.A. Gable. (Benrud, Brent)
November 8, 2021 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Evan Ng.(Trotter, Caleb)
November 8, 2021 Filing 12 Declaration of Brian Meeker in Support of #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Evan Ng. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Trotter, Caleb)
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 Declaration of Mike Burns in Support of #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Evan Ng.(Trotter, Caleb)
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 Declaration of Evan Ng in Support of #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Evan Ng.(Trotter, Caleb)
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Evan Ng.(Trotter, Caleb)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Trotter, Caleb)
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Evan Ng. (Trotter, Caleb)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Caleb Randall Trotter for Evan Ng; granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Erin Elizabeth Wilcox for Evan Ng. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 11/2/2021. (NAH)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Board of Regents of the University of Minnesota, Mark Coyle, Joan T.A. Gable. (KNK)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 21-cv-2404 (NEB/BRT). (KNK)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Caleb R. Trotter. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9112985 filed by Evan Ng. (Diehl, Samuel)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erin E. Wilcox. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9112961 filed by Evan Ng. (Diehl, Samuel)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9112940) filed by Evan Ng. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Diehl, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ng v. Board of Regents of the University of Minnesota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Ng
Represented By: Samuel W Diehl
Represented By: Caleb Randall Trotter
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of Minnesota
Represented By: Brent P Benrud
Represented By: Carrie Ryan Gallia
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Pramas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Coyle
Represented By: Brent P Benrud
Represented By: Carrie Ryan Gallia
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Pramas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan T.A. Gable
Represented By: Brent P Benrud
Represented By: Carrie Ryan Gallia
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Pramas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?