Ristow v. Peterson et al
Plaintiff: Brent A. Ristow
Defendant: Douglas R. Peterson, Thomas H. Boyd, Juan G. Hoyos, John M. Koneck, Mark S. Kuppe, Shawne M. Monahan, Cheryl M. Prince, Pamela A. Thein, Timothy Y. Wong, Carol Martens, Erin C. Wacker, Natasha Karn, Karen McGillic and Amanda Cunningham
Case Number: 0:2021cv02405
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas H. Boyd, Juan G. Hoyos, Natasha Karn, John M. Koneck, Mark S. Kuppe, Carol Martens, Shawne M. Monahan, Douglas R. Peterson, Cheryl M. Prince, Pamela A. Thein, Erin C. Wacker, Timothy Y. Wong re #9 Waiver of Service Executed, #18 Waiver of Service Executed, #12 Waiver of Service Executed, #8 Waiver of Service Executed, #16 Waiver of Service Executed, #19 Waiver of Service Executed, #15 Waiver of Service Executed, #14 Waiver of Service Executed, #10 Waiver of Service Executed, #13 Waiver of Service Executed, #17 Waiver of Service Executed, #11 Waiver of Service Executed (Weiner, Joseph)
December 20, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Timothy Y. Wong. Timothy Y. Wong waiver sent on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Weiner, Joseph)
December 20, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Erin C. Wacker. Erin C. Wacker waiver sent on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Weiner, Joseph)
December 20, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Pamela A. Thein. Pamela A. Thein waiver sent on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Weiner, Joseph)
December 20, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cheryl M. Prince. Cheryl M. Prince waiver sent on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Weiner, Joseph)
December 20, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Douglas R. Peterson. Douglas R. Peterson waiver sent on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Weiner, Joseph)
December 20, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Shawne M. Monahan. Shawne M. Monahan waiver sent on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Weiner, Joseph)
December 20, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Carol Martens. Carol Martens waiver sent on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Weiner, Joseph)
December 20, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Mark S. Kuppe. Mark S. Kuppe waiver sent on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Weiner, Joseph)
December 20, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by John M. Koneck. John M. Koneck waiver sent on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Weiner, Joseph)
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Natasha Karn. Natasha Karn waiver sent on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Weiner, Joseph)
December 20, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Juan G. Hoyos. Juan G. Hoyos waiver sent on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Weiner, Joseph)
December 20, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Thomas H. Boyd. Thomas H. Boyd waiver sent on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Weiner, Joseph)
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 SERVICE by Publication filed by Brent A. Ristow. Last publication date 12/30/21. (kt)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Brent A. Ristow re #1 Complaint and request for waiver of service of summons. (kt) Document QC'd on 12/2/2021 (JME).
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Amanda Cunningham, Natasha Karn, Karen McGillic, Erin C. Wacker. (NAH) cc: Ristow w/ Info Sheet on 10/29/2021 (NAH).
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 FILED IN ERROR - Summons Issued as to Amanda Cunningham, Natasha Karn, Karen McGillic, Erin C. Wacker. cc: Ristow w/ Info Sheet (NAH) Modified text on 10/29/2021 (NAH).
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Thomas H. Boyd, Juan G. Hoyos, John M. Koneck, Mark S. Kuppe, Carol Martens, Shawne M. Monahan, Douglas R. Peterson, Cheryl M. Prince, Pamela A. Thein, Timothy Y. Wong. (NAH) cc: Ristow w/ Info Sheet on 10/29/2021 (NAH).
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas H. Boyd, Amanda Cunningham, Juan G. Hoyos, Natasha Karn, John M. Koneck, Mark S. Kuppe, Carol Martens, Karen McGillic, Shawne M. Monahan, Douglas R. Peterson, Cheryl M. Prince, Pamela A. Thein, Erin C. Wacker, Timothy Y. Wong (filing fee $402, receipt number 34641016342) filed by Brent A. Ristow. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F, #8 Exhibit(s) G, #9 Exhibit(s) H, #10 Exhibit(s) I, #11 Exhibit(s) J, #12 Exhibit(s) K, #13 Civil Cover Sheet) (NAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ristow v. Peterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent A. Ristow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas R. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas H. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan G. Hoyos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Koneck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Kuppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawne M. Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl M. Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela A. Thein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Y. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Martens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin C. Wacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha Karn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen McGillic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?