Miles v. Kallis et al
Petitioner: Kelvin J. Miles
Respondent: Warden Kallis, Federal Medical Center and United States of America
Case Number: 0:2021cv02415
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: David S Doty
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT: Miles shall submit, within 21 days of this Order's date, a filing showing cause why this Court should not dismiss this action for lack of jurisdiction as an unauthorized "second or successive" filing. If Miles fails to submit this filing, the Court will dismiss this action under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/21/2021.(LNP)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 RECEIPT number 44641112458 in the amount of $5 issued to Kelvica J Singletary for Kelvin J Miles. (kt)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Kelvin J. Miles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(kt)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Kelvin J. Miles. (kt)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION FOR HEARING filed by Kelvin J. Miles. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Kelvin J. Miles (JGK)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kelvin J. Miles. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles v. Kallis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kelvin J. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Kallis
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Medical Center
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?