Collingham et al v. City of Northfield et al
Plaintiff: John Collingham, Lori Aasen, Megan Ackerson, Elizabeth Brandenburg, Jennifer Chapman, Laura Daily, Erin Doepke, Gretchen Gilmore, Kathy Hanek, Robyn Hobmeier, Jolene Jakubowsky, Patty Kark, Jill Martens, Jennifer Njagi, Rebecca Novak, Sandy Schlossin, Diane Stewart, Jessica Stratton, Ellen Tichich and Michelle Voegele
Defendant: City of Northfield, d/b/a Northfield Hospital and Clinic, Frederick Allan Rogers, Sarah R. Carlsen, Richard D. Estenson, C.C. Lindstroth, Jessica Peterson White, Robert Shepley, City of Northfield, Frederick Alan Rogers, C.C. Linstroth, Northfield Hospital and Clinics and Charlie Mandile
Case Number: 0:2021cv02466
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E Gernon on behalf of City of Northfield. (Gernon, Amy)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Anne Ricchiuto for City of Northfield. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 12/8/2021. (NAH)
December 3, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anne K. Ricchiuto. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9186485 filed by City of Northfield. (Chambers, Terran)
December 3, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Terran C. Chambers on behalf of City of Northfield. (Chambers, Terran)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on #13 Stipulation. The time in which Defendants shall respond to the Amended Complaint is extended up to and including January 12, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 12/1/2021.(TJS)
November 30, 2021 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Extension of Time to Answer #13 Stipulation,. (Norrie, Jonathan)
November 30, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Sarah R. Carlsen, Richard D. Estenson, C.C. Linstroth, Charlie Mandile, Northfield Hospital and Clinics, Jessica Peterson White, Frederick Alan Rogers, Robert Shepley. Jointly Signed by John Collingham, et al. and City of Northfield. (Norrie, Jonathan)
November 30, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P Norrie on behalf of Sarah R. Carlsen, Richard D. Estenson, C.C. Linstroth, Charlie Mandile, Northfield Hospital and Clinics, Jessica Peterson White, Frederick Alan Rogers, Robert Shepley. (Norrie, Jonathan)
November 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R Whitmore on behalf of Sarah R. Carlsen, Richard D. Estenson, C.C. Linstroth, Charlie Mandile, Northfield Hospital and Clinics, Jessica Peterson White, Frederick Alan Rogers, Robert Shepley. (Whitmore, Mark)
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jolene Jakubowsky, Diane Stewart, Lori Aasen, John Collingham, Jessica Stratton, Sandy Schlossin, Jill Martens, Laura Daily, Megan Ackerson, Kathy Hanek, Patty Kark, Michelle Voegele, Jennifer Njagi, Rebecca Novak, Gretchen Gilmore, Elizabeth Brandenburg, Ellen Tichich, Robyn Hobmeier, Jennifer Chapman. City of Northfield served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Parker, Andrew)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jolene Jakubowsky, Diane Stewart, Lori Aasen, John Collingham, Jessica Stratton, Sandy Schlossin, Jill Martens, Laura Daily, Megan Ackerson, Kathy Hanek, Patty Kark, Michelle Voegele, Jennifer Njagi, Rebecca Novak, Gretchen Gilmore, Elizabeth Brandenburg, Ellen Tichich, Robyn Hobmeier, Jennifer Chapman. Sarah R. Carlsen served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021; Richard D. Estenson served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021; Charlie Mandile served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021; Northfield Hospital and Clinics served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021; Jessica Peterson White served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021; Frederick Alan Rogers served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021; Robert Shepley served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Parker, Andrew)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Sarah R. Carlsen, City of Northfield, Richard D. Estenson, C.C. Linstroth, Charlie Mandile, Northfield Hospital and Clinics, Jessica Peterson White, Frederick Alan Rogers, Robert Shepley. (CLK)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Amended Complaint Sarah R. Carlsen, City of Northfield, Richard D. Estenson, C.C. Lindstroth, Charlie Mandile, Northfield Hospital and Clinics, Jessica Peterson White, Frederick Alan Rogers, Sandy Schlossin, Robert Shepley. (Parker, Andrew)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Ursu on behalf of City of Northfield. (Ursu, John)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Ursu on behalf of City of Northfield, Northfield Hospital and Clinics. (Ursu, John)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Jolene Jakubowsky, Diane Stewart, Lori Aasen, John Collingham, Jessica Stratton, Sandy Schlossin, Jill Martens, Laura Daily, Megan Ackerson, Kathy Hanek, Patty Kark, Michelle Voegele, Jennifer Njagi, Rebecca Novak, Gretchen Gilmore, Elizabeth Brandenburg, Ellen Tichich, Robyn Hobmeier, Jennifer Chapman. No summons requested. (Parker, Andrew)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sarah R. Carlsen, City of Northfield, Richard D. Estenson, C.C. Lindstroth, Jessica Peterson White, Frederick Alan Rogers, Robert Shepley. (MTP)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd/4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 21-cv-02466 PJS/JFD. (MTP)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9132384) filed by Jolene Jakubowsky, Erin Doepke, Diane Stewart, Lori Aasen, John Collingham, Jessica Stratton, Sandy Schlossin, Jill Martens, Laura Daily, Megan Ackerson, Kathy Hanek, Patty Kark, Michelle Voegele, Jennifer Njagi, Rebecca Novak, Gretchen Gilmore, Elizabeth Brandenburg, Ellen Tichich, Robyn Hobmeier, Jennifer Chapman. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Parker, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collingham et al v. City of Northfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Collingham
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Aasen
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Ackerson
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Brandenburg
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Chapman
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Daily
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Doepke
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretchen Gilmore
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Hanek
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Hobmeier
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolene Jakubowsky
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty Kark
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Martens
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Njagi
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Novak
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Schlossin
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Stewart
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Stratton
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Tichich
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Voegele
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Represented By: Justin Shane Boschwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Northfield, d/b/a Northfield Hospital and Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Allan Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah R. Carlsen
Represented By: Jonathan P Norrie
Represented By: Mark R Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Estenson
Represented By: Jonathan P Norrie
Represented By: Mark R Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.C. Lindstroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Peterson White
Represented By: Jonathan P Norrie
Represented By: Mark R Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Shepley
Represented By: Jonathan P Norrie
Represented By: Mark R Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Northfield
Represented By: Amy E Gernon
Represented By: Anne Ricchiuto
Represented By: John W. Ursu
Represented By: Terran C. Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Alan Rogers
Represented By: Jonathan P Norrie
Represented By: Mark R Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.C. Linstroth
Represented By: Jonathan P Norrie
Represented By: Mark R Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northfield Hospital and Clinics
Represented By: John W. Ursu
Represented By: Jonathan P Norrie
Represented By: Mark R Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Mandile
Represented By: Jonathan P Norrie
Represented By: Mark R Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?