American Engineering Testing, Inc. v. Wisconsin Central, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: American Engineering Testing, Inc.
Defendant: Wisconsin Central, Ltd., Illinois Central Railroad Company, Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, Chicago, Central & Pacific Railroad Company, Bessemer Lake Erie Railroad Company, Sault St. Marie Bridge Company, Cedar River Railroad Company, Waterloo Railway Company, Wisconsin Chicago Link, Ltd., Canadian National Railway Company and Pittsburgh & Conneault Dock Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv02532
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - 1. The parties' Stipulation to Stay Action Pending the Outcome of Arbitration #19 is GRANTED; 2. This litigation is STAYED pending the completion of the arbitration between and among Plaintiff American Engineering Testing, Inc. and Defendants; and 3. The parties shall notify the Court, by filing a Joint Status Report on CM/ECF, of the status of this litigation within 7 (seven) days of the date of the issuance of the arbitration award, or within 45 (forty-five) days of the date of this Order, whichever comes first. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/16/2021.(JLB)
December 15, 2021 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #19 Stipulation. (Helenhouse, James)
December 15, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING OUTCOME OF ARBITRATION by Wisconsin Central, Ltd.. Jointly Signed by Cedar River Railroad Company, Canadian National Railway Company, and American Engineering Testing, Inc.. (Helenhouse, James)
December 10, 2021 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff American Engineering Testing, Inc.. (Erickson, Lars)
December 10, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lars C Erickson on behalf of American Engineering Testing, Inc.. (Erickson, Lars)
December 10, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Paschalis on behalf of Cedar River Railroad Company. (Paschalis, Thomas)
December 10, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Paschalis on behalf of Canadian National Railway Company. (Paschalis, Thomas)
December 10, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James Daniel Helenhouse on behalf of Canadian National Railway Company. (Helenhouse, James)
December 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James Daniel Helenhouse on behalf of Cedar River Railroad Company. (Helenhouse, James)
December 9, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Paschalis on behalf of Wisconsin Central, Ltd.. (Paschalis, Thomas)
December 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James Daniel Helenhouse on behalf of Wisconsin Central, Ltd.. (Helenhouse, James)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James Daniel Helenhouse for Canadian National Railway Company, Cedar River Railroad Company, and for Wisconsin Central, Ltd.; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas C. Paschalis for Canadian National Railway Company, Cedar River Railroad Company, and for Wisconsin Central, Ltd. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/23/2021. (NAH)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (5th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-2532 (PJS/LIB). (lmb)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas C. Paschalis. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9156071 filed by Canadian National Railway Company, Cedar River Railroad Company, Wisconsin Central, Ltd.. (Gernes, Julius)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James D. Helenhouse. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9156050 filed by Canadian National Railway Company, Cedar River Railroad Company, Wisconsin Central, Ltd.. (Gernes, Julius)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing James D. Helenhouse, Thomas C. Paschalis as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (lmb)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Canadian National Railway Company. (Gernes, Julius)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Cedar River Railroad Company. (Gernes, Julius)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Wisconsin Central, Ltd.. (Gernes, Julius)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Julius W Gernes on behalf of Canadian National Railway Company, Cedar River Railroad Company, Wisconsin Central, Ltd.. (Gernes, Julius)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County District Court, case number 69-DU-CV-21-1961 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9155490) filed by Canadian National Railway Company, Wisconsin Central, Ltd., Cedar River Railroad Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gernes, Julius)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Engineering Testing, Inc. v. Wisconsin Central, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Engineering Testing, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin J Kirk
Represented By: Jeffrey W Coleman
Represented By: Lars C Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Central, Ltd.
Represented By: Julius W Gernes
Represented By: James Daniel Helenhouse
Represented By: Thomas C. Paschalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Central Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago, Central & Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bessemer Lake Erie Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sault St. Marie Bridge Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar River Railroad Company
Represented By: Julius W Gernes
Represented By: James Daniel Helenhouse
Represented By: Thomas C. Paschalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterloo Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Chicago Link, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canadian National Railway Company
Represented By: Julius W Gernes
Represented By: James Daniel Helenhouse
Represented By: Thomas C. Paschalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittsburgh & Conneault Dock Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?