Prouty v. Miles et al
Plaintiff: Darrell D. Prouty
Defendant: David N. Miles, Matt Dahl, Derek J. Koecher, Jeremy Wuori, Suzanne A. Swenson, Deborah K. Barron, Jessica J. Joyal, David Borchardt and Kristi Wagner
Case Number: 0:2021cv02606
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
2 Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Deborah K. Barron, David Borchardt, Matt Dahl, Jessica J. Joyal, Derek J. Koecher, David N. Miles, Suzanne A. Swenson, Kristi Wagner, Jeremy Wuori. (CLK)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/11/2022. (EB)
December 26, 2021 Filing 5 (Text-only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the elevation of Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez to District Judge, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-2606 WMW-TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. The current hearings and deadlines in these cases may be reset (if necessary) by the new MJ Courtroom Deputy. (LJG)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
December 2, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Darrell Dean Prouty by Darrell D. Prouty. (NAH)
December 2, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Darrell D. Prouty. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(NAH)
December 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deborah K. Barron, David Borchardt, Matt Dahl, Jessica J. Joyal, Derek J. Koecher, David N. Miles, Suzanne A. Swenson, Kristi Wagner, Jeremy Wuori filed by Darrell D. Prouty. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Part 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Part 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope) (NAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prouty v. Miles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell D. Prouty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David N. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Dahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek J. Koecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Wuori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne A. Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah K. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica J. Joyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Borchardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?