Lane v. Century International Arms, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ian Lane
Defendant: Century International Arms, Inc., Hunters Outlet, Remington Arms Company, LLC, SGM Tactical, LLC, John Doe, Richard Doe, XYZ entity, the, Remington Arms Company and Richard Roe
Case Number: 0:2022cv00135
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #31 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion . (Bryant, Michael)
March 14, 2022 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Ian Lane. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bryant, Michael)
March 4, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION for Joinder to Century Int'l's Motion to Dismiss filed by SGM Tactical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Azman, Mark)
February 23, 2022 Filing 29 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #25 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Century International Arms, Inc..(Curry, Kevin)
February 23, 2022 Filing 28 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #25 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Century International Arms, Inc..(Curry, Kevin)
February 23, 2022 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #25 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Century International Arms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Curry, Kevin)
February 23, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #25 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Curry, Kevin)
February 23, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Century International Arms, Inc.. (Curry, Kevin)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
February 16, 2022 Filing 23 Defendant SGM Tactical, LLC's ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint filed by SGM Tactical, LLC. (Azman, Mark)
February 10, 2022 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Bradley Strand re #21 Answer to Amended Complaint byHunters Outlet. (Quinton, Corey)
February 10, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint filed by Hunters Outlet. (Quinton, Corey)
February 9, 2022 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Ian Lane. No summons requested. (Bryant, Michael)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR CENTURY INTERNATIONAL ARMS, INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Century International Arms, Inc. answer due 2/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/31/2022. (JLB)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ryan Erdreich for Century International Arms, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/28/2022. (ABR)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Anthony M Pisciotti for Century International Arms, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/27/2022. (ABR)
January 27, 2022 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant SGM Tactical, LLC. (Azman, Mark)
January 27, 2022 Filing 15 Defendant SGM Tactical, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint filed by SGM Tactical, LLC. (Azman, Mark)
January 27, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R Azman on behalf of SGM Tactical, LLC. (Azman, Mark)
January 27, 2022 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Hunters Outlet. (Quinton, Corey)
January 27, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Bradley Strand re #11 Answer to Complaint byHunters Outlet. (Quinton, Corey)
January 27, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Hunters Outlet. (Quinton, Corey)
January 27, 2022 Filing 10 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Remington Arms Company, LLC by Century International Arms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - Lane Proof of Claim, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B - Affidavit of Service of Monthly Operating Reports)(Curry, Kevin)
January 27, 2022 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Curry, Kevin)
January 27, 2022 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Century International Arms, Inc.. (Curry, Kevin)
January 26, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anthony M. Pisciotti. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9288795 filed by Century International Arms, Inc.. (Curry, Kevin)
January 26, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ryan L. Erdreich. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9288747 filed by Century International Arms, Inc.. (Curry, Kevin)
January 25, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Corey J. Quinton on behalf of Hunters Outlet. (Quinton, Corey)
January 24, 2022 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
January 20, 2022 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Sixth Division Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 22-cv-135 WMW/LIB. (kt)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Century International Arms, Inc.. (Curry, Kevin)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial District Court (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9276550) filed by Century International Arms, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet) (Curry, Kevin) Modified text on 1/20/2022 (kt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. Century International Arms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Lane
Represented By: Michael A Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century International Arms, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin P Curry
Represented By: Anthony M Pisciotti
Represented By: Ryan Erdreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunters Outlet
Represented By: Corey J. Quinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remington Arms Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGM Tactical, LLC
Represented By: Mark R Azman
Represented By: Michael M. Skram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ entity, the
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remington Arms Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?