Alvarado-Ortiz v. FPC Yankton
Petitioner: Juan Paublo Alvarado-Ortiz
Respondent: FPC Yankton
Case Number: 0:2022cv00206
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FPC Yankton re #5 Declaration, #4 Response to Habeas Petition (Hoskins, Adam)
February 23, 2022 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Shannon Boldt re #4 Response to Habeas Petition by FPC Yankton . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoskins, Adam)
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FPC Yankton. (Hoskins, Adam)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER 1.Respondent is directed to file an answer to the petition for a writ of habeas corpus of Petitioner Juan Pablo Alvarado-Ortiz, within 21 days of this Orders date, certifying the true cause and proper duration of Petitioners confinement and showing cause why the writ should not be granted in this case. 2.Respondents answer should include:a.Such affidavits and exhibits as are needed to establish the lawfulness and correct duration of Petitioners incarceration, in light of the issues raised in the petition; b.A reasoned memorandum of law and fact fully stating Respondents legal position on Petitioners claims; andc.Respondents recommendation on whether an evidentiary hearing should be conducted in this matter.3.If Petitioner intends to file a reply to Respondents answer, he must do so within 21 days of the date when the answer is filed. Thereafter, no further submissions from either party will be permitted, except as authorized by Court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/3/2022.(TMA)
January 28, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J Hoskins on behalf of FPC Yankton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hoskins, Adam)
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 4-1113039) filed by Juan Paublo Alvarado-Ortiz. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JGK) Qc'd on 2/11/2022 (KNK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarado-Ortiz v. FPC Yankton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Paublo Alvarado-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FPC Yankton
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Adam J Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?