Greene et al v. Meeker County Department of Human Services (DHS)
Plaintiff: Kyle Richard Greene and Krystle Lynn Greene
Defendant: Meeker County Department of Human Services (DHS)
Case Number: 0:2022cv00291
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Kyle Richard Greene as to Meeker County Department of Human Services (DHS). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying as moot #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/14/2022. (LNP)
March 10, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Meeker County Department of Human Services (DHS). (ACH) cc: Kyle Richard Greene. Modified text on 3/10/2022 (ACH).
March 9, 2022 Filing 8 RECEIPT number 44641113452 in the amount of $402 issued to Krystle Lynne Greene. (ACH)
March 9, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Krystle Lynn Greene re #6 Notice (Other), #5 Amended Complaint (ACH)
March 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CORRECTION by Krystle Lynn Greene, Kyle Richard Greene re #5 Amended Complaint (ACH)
March 9, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Meeker County Department of Human Services (DHS). filed by Kyle Richard Greene, Krystle Lynn Greene. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ACH) Modified file date on 3/10/2022 (ACH).
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/24/2022.(LNP)
February 1, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
January 31, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Kyle Richard Greene. (NAH)
January 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Meeker County Department of Human Services (DHS) filed by Kyle Richard Greene, Krystle Lynn Greene. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Civil Rights-Other ADA list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NAH) Document QC'd by ACH on 2/8/2022 (ACH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene et al v. Meeker County Department of Human Services (DHS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Richard Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystle Lynn Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meeker County Department of Human Services (DHS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?