Scales v. State of Minnesota
Petitioner: Maurice James Scales
Respondent: State of Minnesota
Case Number: 0:2022cv00349
Filed: February 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending dismissal without prejudice of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, and denial as moot of: #3 MOTION for Expungement or Sealing - 5th Degree Drug Poss.; #4 MOTION for Expungement or Sealing - 5th Degree Domestic Assaltt; #5 MOTION to Pardon Conviction Ineligiblety, Otherwise Restoting applicable Rights; #6 MOTION to Pertain Conviction; and #7 MOTION to Reply too Mr.Scales Dapotinary Request for Seal Cert from the Courtrs. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/25/2022. (JLD)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs; and granting #19 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/25/2022. (JLD)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Maurice James Scales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(MKB) Document QC'd on 2/23/2022 by MMP. (Pages 2 & 3 out of order-did not rescan)Modified text on 2/23/2022 (MMP).
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 EXHIBIT re #10 Order to Party File Document/Respond to Court filed by Maurice James Scales. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ACH) Document QC'd on 2/28/2022 (MKB).
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 EXHIBIT re #10 Order to Party File Document/Respond to Court filed by Maurice James Scales. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ACH) Document QC'd on 2/24/2022 (JME).
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 EXHIBIT re #10 Order to Party File Document/Respond to Court filed by Maurice James Scales. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ACH) Document QC'd on 2/28/2022 (MKB).
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (Text-Only) ORDER in response to Petitioner's Notice at #13 re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Per the Court's Order at #10 , Petitioner is required to file a completed IFP Application within 21 days of that Order's date, or by 2/28/2022. Petitioner's attestations by notice (such as that filed on 2/16/22 at #13 ), letter, or other document besides a completed IFP Application will not suffice for this Court to make a determination on Petitioner's IFP status in this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 2/17/2022. (JLD) Modified text on 2/17/2022 (kt). Modified text on 2/17/2022 (kt).
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EXHIBIT re #13 Notice (Other) filed by Maurice James Scales. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ACH) Document QC'd on 2/28/2022 (MTB)..
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE by Maurice James Scales re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Maurice James Scales (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ACH) Document QC'd on 2/28/2022 (MTB).
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P Schmidt on behalf of State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidt, Jonathan)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by State of Minnesota Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Maurice James Scales. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 2/7/2022. (JLD)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Maurice James Scales (NAH) Modified text on 2/7/2022 (MMP). Document QC'd on 2/15/2022 (ACH).
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM of Law re #6 MOTION to Pertain Conviction filed by Maurice James Scales.(NAH) Document QC'd on 2/15/2022 (ACH).
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Reply too Mr.Scales Dapotinary Request for Seal Cert from the Courts filed by Maurice James Scales. (NAH) Document QC'd on 2/15/2022 (ACH).
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Pertain Conviction filed by Maurice James Scales. (NAH) Document QC'd on 2/15/2022 (ACH).
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Pardon Conviction Ineligiblety, Otherwise Restoting applicable Rights filed by Maurice James Scales. (NAH) Document QC'd on 2/15/2022 (ACH).
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Expungement or Sealing - 5th Degree Domestic Assaltt filed by Maurice James Scales. (NAH) Document QC'd on 2/15/2022 (ACH).
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Expungement or Sealing - 5th Degree Drug Poss. filed by Maurice James Scales. (NAH) Document QC'd on 2/15/2022 (ACH).
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Maurice James Scales. (NAH) Document QC'd on 2/15/2022 (ACH).
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Maurice James Scales. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (NAH) Document QC'd on 2/15/2022 (ACH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scales v. State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maurice James Scales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Represented By: Jonathan P Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?