Aery v. Nohre et al
Plaintiff: James Paul Aery
Defendant: Kyle Nohre and Beltrami County
Case Number: 0:2022cv00491
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kyle Nohre. Kyle Nohre waiver sent on 3/15/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. (Ebert, Dyan)
April 6, 2022 Filing 15 LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE filed by James Aery regarding service for Defendant Kyle Nohre. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP) Document QCd on 4/21/2022 (MMG).
March 30, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beltrami County, Kyle Nohre re #13 Notice of Appearance (Ebert, Dyan)
March 30, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Dyan J Ebert on behalf of Beltrami County, Kyle Nohre. (Ebert, Dyan)
March 28, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER TO THE COURT filed by James Aery. re: assistance with service (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP)
March 18, 2022 Filing 10 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Kyle Nohre. (MMP) Modified text on 3/18/2022 (MMP).
March 18, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Beltrami County served on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. (MMP) Modified text on 3/18/2022 (MMP).
March 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service for Defendant Kyle Nohre. Documents have been mailed to all listed defendants: Order Granting IFP, Complaint, two Waiver of Services (AO 399), and one Prepaid Envelope. Waiver of Service due by 4/14/2022. (kt)
March 14, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by James Paul Aery as to Kyle Nohre. (MMP) Modified text on 4/6/2022 (MMP). Document QC'd on 4/6/2022 (MTB).
March 14, 2022 Filing 8 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by James Paul Aery as to Kyle Nohre in his official capacity. (MMP) Modified text on 3/18/2022 (MMP).
March 4, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Beltrami County, Kyle Nohre. (MMP)
March 3, 2022 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Prison Authorities re: Filing Fee Due as to James Paul Aery enclosing re #3 Order on Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Prison Authorities, Beltrami County Jail (MMP)
March 3, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete cc: Aery. (MMP)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/2/2022. (EB)
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by James Paul Aery. (NAH) Document QC'd on 3/2/2022 (JME).
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Beltrami County, Kyle Nohre filed by James Paul Aery. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 6th/Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (NAH) Document QC'd on 3/2/2022 (JME).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aery v. Nohre et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Paul Aery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Nohre
Represented By: Dyan J Ebert
Represented By: Elle M Lannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beltrami County
Represented By: Dyan J Ebert
Represented By: Elle M Lannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?