Johnson v. Ramsey County ADC
Plaintiff: Eugene Laron Johnson
Defendant: Ramsey County ADC, Officer 2369 and Sgt Sean Delrosario
Case Number: 0:2022cv00494
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2022 Filing 15 REQUEST to Seize all video surveillance filed by Eugene Laron Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK)
April 20, 2022 Filing 14 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Prison Authorities re: Filing Fee Due as to enclosing re #12 Order on Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Prison Authorities, MCF- St. Cloud. (MKB)
April 20, 2022 Filing 13 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete cc: Johnson. (MKB)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 4/19/2022. (JRS)
April 13, 2022 Filing 11 FACTS re #1 Prisoner Complaint, filed by Eugene Laron Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ACH)
April 11, 2022 Filing 10 (Restricted) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Officer 2369, Ramsey County ADC, Sean Delrosario. filed by Eugene Laron Johnson. (KNK)
April 11, 2022 Filing 9 LETTER/NOTICE of Change of Address by Eugene Laron Johnson (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK)
April 1, 2022 Filing 8 EXHIBIT re #3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Eugene Laron Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ACH) Qc'd on 4/13/2022 (KNK).
March 30, 2022 Filing 7 EXHIBIT #5 re #1 Prisoner Complaint, filed by Eugene Laron Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ACH)
March 28, 2022 Filing 6 EXHIBIT re #1 Prisoner Complaint, filed by Eugene Laron Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ACH)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 3/18/2022. (JRS)
March 14, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from Eugene Laron Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(KNK) Document QC'd on 3/31/2022 (MTB).
March 14, 2022 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Eugene Laron Johnson. (KNK) Document QC'd on 3/31/2022 (MTB).
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Eugene Laron Johnson re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Johnson (NAH)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Ramsey County ADC filed by Eugene Laron Johnson. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (NAH) Document QC'd on 3/4/2022 (JME).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Ramsey County ADC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Laron Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramsey County ADC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer 2369
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Sean Delrosario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?