Fiorito v. Fikes
Petitioner: Michael Fiorito
Respondent: Warden Fikes
Case Number: 0:2022cv00512
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
2 Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER in Response to #18 Respondent's Second Request to Extend Time to Respond to Petitioner. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent shall have up to and including May 4, 2022, to respond to petitioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/27/2022.(LNP)
April 26, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fikes re #18 Request, #19 Proposed Order to Judge - Other (Rau, Kristen)
April 26, 2022 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Request to Extend Time to Respond to Petitioner #18 Request. (Rau, Kristen)
April 26, 2022 Filing 18 REQUEST to Extend time to Respond to Petitioner by Fikes. (Rau, Kristen)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #11 MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. This matter is before the Court on Petitioner's Motion for an Emergency Preliminary Injunction and/or TRO and Motion to Show Cause (ECF No. #11 ). Respondent is directed to respond to that motion on or before April 27, 2022. If Petitioner intends to file a reply, he must do so within 28 days of when the response is filed. Thereafter no further submissions from either party will be permitted, except as authorized by Court order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/28/2022.(LNP)
March 25, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(KDS) Document QC'd on 4/28/2022 (MTB).
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER in Response to #7 Request for Extension of Time to File a Response to Petitioner's Petition. Fikes response due 4/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/24/2022.(LNP)
March 23, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fikes re #7 Request, #8 Proposed Order to Judge - Other (Rau, Kristen)
March 23, 2022 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Request to Extend Time to Respond to Petition #7 Request. (Rau, Kristen)
March 23, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST to Extend Time to Respond to Petition by Fikes. (Rau, Kristen)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Katherine M. Menendez recused. Case reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 22-cv-512 WMW/HB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 3/2/2022.(kt)
March 3, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Elise Rau on behalf of Fikes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rau, Kristen)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Respondent to file answer within 28 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/2/2022. (LNP)
March 2, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(JGK) Document QC'd on 3/30/2022 (MTB).
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Fiorito. Case assigned to Judge Kate M. Menendez per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 3/30/2022 (MTB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiorito v. Fikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Fiorito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Fikes
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?