Coleman v. Ericka et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Coleman
Defendant: Ericka, Park 7 Apartment Mgr and Owners, St Olives
Case Number: 0:2022cv00526
Filed: March 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 4/27/2022. (JRS)
April 14, 2022 Filing 5 EXHIBIT re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Lawrence Coleman filed by Lawrence Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(MTB)
April 14, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Lawrence Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTB)
March 14, 2022 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable #3 . Mail sent to Lawrence Coleman at Sherburne County Jail, 13880 Business Center Drive, Elk River, MN 22330 was returned - not deliverable as addressed - unable to forward - not in custody. (MTB) Modified text on 3/15/2022 (MTB). Document QC'd on 3/31/2022 (MTB).
March 11, 2022 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable #2 . Mail not resent to Lawrence Coleman/Not Deliverable as Addressed/Unable to Forward. (kt)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 3/7/2022. (JRS)
March 2, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Lawrence Coleman. (JGK) Qc'd on 3/17/2022 (KNK).
March 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ericka, Owners, St Olives, Park 7 Apartment Mgr filed by Lawrence Coleman. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Kate M. Menendez per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (JGK) qc'd on 3/17/2022 (KNK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Ericka et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park 7 Apartment Mgr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owners, St Olives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?