Braun v. State of Minnesota et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Christopher Braun
Defendant: State of Minnesota, County of Washington, City of Bayport, Minnesota Department of Corrections, Paul Schnell, Guy Bosch, Victor Wanchena, CPD Huppert, L. McCoy and MCF-STW
Case Number: 0:2022cv00528
Filed: March 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2022 Filing 11 EXHIBIT re #10 MOTION to Proceed without Paying any of the Partial Filing Fee due to Adverse Party Failure to Comply with Orders from the Court filed by Nathan Christopher Braun. (MMP)
April 25, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Proceed without Paying any of the Partial Filing Fee due to Adverse Party Failure to Comply with Orders from the Court filed by Nathan Christopher Braun. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP)
April 22, 2022 Filing 9 Supplement to #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Nathan Christopher Braun. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(MMP)
April 14, 2022 Filing 8 EXHIBIT re: #7 filed by Nathan Christopher Braun.(MMP)
April 14, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #4 Order/Notice to Attorney filed by Nathan Christopher Braun. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court has been advised that prison authorities at MCF-Stillwater, where Plaintiff is currently incarcerated, need additional time to prepare an accurate prison trust account statement responsive to this Court's orders in Case Nos. 22-cv-710 (ECF No. #5 ) and 22-cv-528 (ECF No. #4 ). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the required documentation shall be mailed to the Court no later than April 22, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/13/2022.(LNP)
March 30, 2022 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Prison Authorities re: Filing Fee Due as to enclosing re #4 Order/Notice to Attorney cc: Prison Authorities, MCF-Stillwater. (kt)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 3/29/2022. (JRS)
March 16, 2022 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT PLEADING PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 15(d) (NOT Motion) re #1 Prisoner Complaint filed by Nathan Christopher Braun. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(MMP) Document QCd on 3/25/2022 (MMG).
March 2, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Nathan Christopher Braun. (JGK) Qc'd on 3/25/2022 (KNK).
March 2, 2022 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Guy Bosch, City of Bayport, County of Washington, Huppert, MCF-STW, L. McCoy, Minnesota Department of Corrections, Paul Schnell, State of Minnesota, Victor Wanchena filed by Nathan Christopher Braun. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JGK) Qc'd on 3/25/2022 (KNK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braun v. State of Minnesota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Christopher Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bayport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Schnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Bosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Wanchena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPD Huppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCF-STW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?