Cox v. Acting Commissioner of Social Security et al
Plaintiff: Samuel I. Cox
Defendant: Acting Commissioner of Social Security, Social Security Administration, SSA, Barbara Hunt, Office of Disability Adjudication and Review and Social Security Office
Case Number: 0:2022cv00546
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2022 Filing 6 OBJECTION TO #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Samuel I. Cox. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 4/12/2022 (CLK).
March 24, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Samuel I. Cox; #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Samuel I. Cox; #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Samuel I. Cox. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/24/2022. (ALM)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Order to show cause for a preliminary injuction and restraining order. (JGK) Document QC'd on 4/4/2022 (JME).
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Samuel I. Cox. (JGK) Document QC'd on 4/4/2022 (JME).
March 4, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Samuel I. Cox. (JGK) Document QC'd on 4/4/2022 (JME).
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Acting Commissioner of Social Security, Barbara Hunt, Office of Disability Adjudication and Review, SSA, Social Security Administration, Social Security Office filed by Samuel I. Cox. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 4/4/2022 (JME).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Acting Commissioner of Social Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel I. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Disability Adjudication and Review
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?