Henderson v. State of Minnesota et al
Petitioner: Mike Cordale Henderson
Respondent: State of Minnesota and County of Hennepin
Case Number: 0:2022cv00566
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2022 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #9 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Mike Cordale Henderson filed by Mike Cordale Henderson, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Mike Cordale Henderson Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/21/2022.(TMA)
March 17, 2022 Filing 9 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Mike Cordale Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTB) Document QC'd on 3/21/2022 (KDS).
March 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P Schmidt on behalf of County of Hennepin, State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidt, Jonathan)
March 8, 2022 Filing 7 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by County of Hennepin, State of Minnesota Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Frank, Matthew)
March 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
March 7, 2022 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Mike Cordale Henderson (JGK)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER from Mike Cordale Henderson TO CLERK'S OFFICE. (JGK)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 BRIEF re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,. (JGK)
March 4, 2022 Filing 2 BRIEF re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,. (JGK)
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Mike Cordale Henderson. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. State of Minnesota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mike Cordale Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Jonathan P Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: County of Hennepin
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Jonathan P Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?