Kaplan et al v. Harrington et al
Plaintiff: Zoe Kaplan, Jack Flom and Samira Hassan
Defendant: John Harrington, Sarah Strommen, Matthew Langer, David Hutchinson and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 0:2022cv00640
Filed: March 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #10 Stipulation. John Harrington answer due 5/16/2022; Matthew Langer answer due 5/16/2022; Sarah Strommen answer due 5/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/31/2022.(TJS)
March 30, 2022 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Farrell, Peter)
March 30, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Sarah Strommen. Jointly Signed by Kaplan, Flom, Hassan, Harrington, and Langer. (Farrell, Peter)
March 30, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Hsu on behalf of John Harrington, Matthew Langer. (Hsu, Alexander)
March 30, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D Weiner on behalf of John Harrington, Matthew Langer. (Weiner, Joseph)
March 24, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Oliver J Larson on behalf of Sarah Strommen. (Larson, Oliver)
March 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Sarah Strommen. (Farrell, Peter)
March 15, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Devona L Wells on behalf of David Hutchinson. (Wells, Devona)
March 12, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah C S McLaren on behalf of David Hutchinson. (McLaren, Sarah)
March 10, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John Does 1-10, John Harrington, David Hutchinson, Matthew Langer, Sarah Strommen. (MKB)
March 10, 2022 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 22-cv-640 (JRT/JFD). (MKB)
March 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9378528) filed by Zoe Asher Kaplan, Samira Omar Hassan, Jack Nickolaus Flom. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Riach, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaplan et al v. Harrington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoe Kaplan
Represented By: Kevin C Riach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Flom
Represented By: Kevin C Riach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samira Hassan
Represented By: Kevin C Riach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Harrington
Represented By: Alexander Hsu
Represented By: Joseph D Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Strommen
Represented By: Oliver J Larson
Represented By: Peter J Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Langer
Represented By: Alexander Hsu
Represented By: Joseph D Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hutchinson
Represented By: Devona L Wells
Represented By: Sarah C S McLaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?