Forte v. Access North Center for Independent Living of Northeastern Minnesota
Plaintiff: Natalie Forte
Defendant: Access North Center for Independent Living of Northeastern Minnesota
Case Number: 0:2022cv00711
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2022. Fact Discovery due by 3/31/2023. Expert Discovery due by 3/31/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2022. Motions (non-disp) due 4/30/2023. Motions (disp) due by 5/31/2023. Ready for trial due by 9/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/29/2022.(JLB)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 **DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - REFILED AT #11 ** PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2022. Fact Discovery due by 3/31/2023. Expert Discovery due by 3/31/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2022. Motions (non-disp) due 4/30/2023. Motions (disp) due by 5/31/2023. Ready for trial due by 9/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/29/2022.(JLB) Modified text on 4/29/2022 (JLB).
April 27, 2022 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Natalie Forte. (Ahlberg, Ryan)
April 26, 2022 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF CASE as to All Defendants. (Hoglund, Lauren)
April 26, 2022 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Access North Center for Independent Living of Northeastern Minnesota. Jointly Signed by Natalie Forte and Access North Center for Independent Living of Northeastern Minnesota.(Hoglund, Lauren)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
March 18, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Access North Center for Independent Living of Northeastern Minnesota. (Davidson, William)
March 18, 2022 Filing 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 5th Division Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 22-cv-711 (ECT/LIB). (MMP)
March 18, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Hoglund on behalf of Access North Center for Independent Living of Northeastern Minnesota. (Hoglund, Lauren)
March 18, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Access North Center for Independent Living of Northeastern Minnesota filed by Access North Center for Independent Living of Northeastern Minnesota. (Davidson, William)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County District Court (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9394945) with Attached Complaint filed by Access North Center for Independent Living of Northeastern Minnesota. No summons requested. (Davidson, William) Modified text on 3/18/2022 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forte v. Access North Center for Independent Living of Northeastern Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Forte
Represented By: Ryan H Ahlberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access North Center for Independent Living of Northeastern Minnesota
Represented By: Lauren Hoglund
Represented By: William L Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?