Luoma Enterprises of Duluth, Inc v. The Home Depot, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Luoma Enterprises and Luoma Enterprises of Duluth, Inc
Defendant: The Home Depot, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Tractor Supply Co., Ace Hardware Corp., Menard, Inc., United Hardware Distributing Co., Gullander Hardware Co., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Health Corp., Amazon.com, Inc., eBay Inc. and Home Depot, Inc., The
Case Number: 0:2022cv00714
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luoma Enterprises of Duluth, Inc. Ace Hardware Corp. waiver sent on 3/24/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Ali, Jeffer)
April 26, 2022 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luoma Enterprises of Duluth, Inc. Tractor Supply Co. waiver sent on 3/24/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Ali, Jeffer)
April 26, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luoma Enterprises of Duluth, Inc. Amazon.com, Inc. waiver sent on 3/24/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Ali, Jeffer)
April 25, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luoma Enterprises of Duluth, Inc. United Hardware Distributing Co. waiver sent on 3/24/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Ali, Jeffer)
April 25, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luoma Enterprises of Duluth, Inc. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. waiver sent on 3/24/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Ali, Jeffer)
April 25, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luoma Enterprises of Duluth, Inc. CVS Health Corp. waiver sent on 3/24/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Ali, Jeffer)
April 21, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luoma Enterprises of Duluth, Inc. eBay Inc. waiver sent on 3/24/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Ali, Jeffer)
April 21, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luoma Enterprises of Duluth, Inc. Menard, Inc. waiver sent on 3/24/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Ali, Jeffer)
April 21, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luoma Enterprises of Duluth, Inc. Gullander Hardware Co. waiver sent on 3/24/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Ali, Jeffer)
April 21, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luoma Enterprises of Duluth, Inc. Home Depot, Inc., The waiver sent on 3/24/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Ali, Jeffer)
April 21, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luoma Enterprises of Duluth, Inc. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. waiver sent on 3/24/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Ali, Jeffer)
April 4, 2022 Filing 7 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
April 1, 2022 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Luoma Enterprises of Duluth, Inc. (Kuhlmann, Nicholas)
March 23, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Kuhlmann, Nicholas)
March 21, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to eBay Inc.. (KNK)
March 21, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ace Hardware Corp., Amazon.com, Inc., CVS Health Corp., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Gullander Hardware Co., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Menard, Inc., The Home Depot, Inc., Tractor Supply Co., United Hardware Distributing Co., eBay Inc.. (KNK)
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 5th - Copyright & Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 22-cv-714 (WMW/LIB). (KNK)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9395289) filed by Luoma Enterprises. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A-K, #3 Exhibit(s) L, #4 Exhibit(s) M) (Ali, Jeffer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luoma Enterprises of Duluth, Inc v. The Home Depot, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luoma Enterprises
Represented By: Jeffer Ali, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luoma Enterprises of Duluth, Inc
Represented By: Jeffer Ali, I
Represented By: Nicholas S Kuhlmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tractor Supply Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Hardware Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Hardware Distributing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gullander Hardware Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?