Broussard v. United States of America et al.
Petitioner: Aaron Rhy Broussard
Respondent: United States of America, Thomas M. Hollenhorst, Melinda A. Williams, Charles J. Novats, Jr. and U.S. Department of Justice
Case Number: 0:2022cv00725
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Nancy E Brasel
2 Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
3 Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Filing 19 USCA Case Number 22-1777 for #12 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by Aaron Rhy Broussard. (MMG)
April 13, 2022 Filing 18 TRANSMITTAL OF APPEAL LETTER TO U. S. COURT OF APPEALS, 8TH CIRCUIT, Re: Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit #12 . (ACH)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #13 Application on Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal; transferring #14 Motion to Stay; denying #16 Application on Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 4/13/2022. (SMD)
April 11, 2022 Filing 16 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal (Second) filed by Aaron Rhy Broussard. (kt) Document QC'd on 5/6/2022 (MTB).
April 11, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL (SECOND) by Aaron Rhy Broussard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) Document QC'd on 5/6/2022 (MTB).
April 11, 2022 Filing 14 EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY OR INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL filed by Aaron Rhy Broussard. (kt) Document QC'd on 5/6/2022 (MTB).
April 11, 2022 Filing 13 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal filed by Aaron Rhy Broussard. (kt) Document QC'd on 5/6/2022 (MTB).
April 11, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 8TH CIRCUIT as to #11 Judgment, #10 Amended Order on Motion by Aaron Rhy Broussard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) Document QC'd on 5/6/2022 (MTB).
March 29, 2022 Filing 11 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal, #2 Appeal Packet)(KDS)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER SUMMARILY DENYING PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. The petition for a writ of habeas corpus of petitioner Aaron Rhy Broussard [Doc. No. 1] is SUMMARILY DENIED. This matter is DISMISSED. Mr. Broussard's application to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. No. 2] is DENIED. Mr. Broussard's motion for a temporary restraining order [Doc. No. 5] is DENIED. It is certified that any appeal from the judgment in this matter would not be taken in good faith. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/28/2022. (SMD)
March 28, 2022 Filing 9 EXHIBIT re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Aaron Rhy Broussard filed by Aaron Rhy Broussard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ACH) Document QC'd on 4/28/2022 (MTB).
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SUMMARILY DENYING PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. The petition for a writ of habeas corpus of petitioner Aaron Rhy Broussard [Doc. No. 1] is SUMMARILY DENIED. This matter is DISMISSED. Mr. Broussard's application to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. No. 2] is DENIED. Mr. Broussard's motion for a temporary restraining order [Doc. No. 5] is DENIED. It is certified that any appeal from the judgment in this matter would not be taken in good faith. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/23/2022. (SMD)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright for all further proceedings. Judge Nancy E. Brasel, Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 22-cv-725 (SRN/ECW). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 3/22/2022.(MMP)
March 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad A Blumenfield on behalf of United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Blumenfield, Chad)
March 21, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Aaron Rhy Broussard. (JGK) Document QC'd on 4/11/2022 (JGK).
March 21, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Plaintiff re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Aaron Rhy Broussard. (JGK) Document QC'd on 4/11/2022 (JGK).
March 21, 2022 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Aaron Rhy Broussard.(JGK) Document QC'd on 4/11/2022 (JGK).
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Aaron Rhy Broussard. (JGK) Document QC'd on 4/11/2022 (JGK).
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Aaron Rhy Broussard. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (JGK) Document QC'd on 4/11/2022 (JGK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broussard v. United States of America et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aaron Rhy Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Chad A Blumenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas M. Hollenhorst
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Melinda A. Williams
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles J. Novats, Jr.
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?