Hertzberger v. Rardin
Petitioner: Robert Hertzberger
Respondent: Jarid Rardin
Case Number: 0:2022cv00756
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2022 Filing 15 EXHIBIT re #14 Reply filed by Robert Hertzberger.(MTB)
May 19, 2022 Filing 14 REPLY re #11 Response filed by Robert Hertzberger. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(MTB)
May 10, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jarid Rardin re #11 Response, #12 Declaration (Blumenfield, Chad)
May 10, 2022 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Todd Valento re #11 Response by Jarid Rardin . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Blumenfield, Chad)
May 10, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jarid Rardin.(Blumenfield, Chad)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/19/2022. (EB)
April 11, 2022 Filing 9 EXHIBIT List re #8 Memorandum, filed by Robert Hertzberger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F)(CLK) Document QC'd on 4/25/2022 (CLK).
April 11, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Motions for Declaratory Judgment and Advisory Opinsion Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Robert Hertzberger. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 4/25/2022 (CLK).
April 7, 2022 Filing 7 RECEIPT number 44641113728 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Robert Hertzberger. (MTB)
April 4, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
March 31, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad A Blumenfield on behalf of Jarid Rardin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Blumenfield, Chad)
March 31, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad A Blumenfield on behalf of Jarid Rardin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Blumenfield, Chad)
March 28, 2022 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Robert Hertzberger (JGK)
March 28, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER from Robert Hertzberger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(JGK) Document QC'd on 4/28/2022 (MTB).
March 28, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Robert Hertzberger. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JGK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2022: #2 Cover Letter) (JGK). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2022: #3 Exhibit(s)) (JGK). Document QC'd on 4/28/2022 (MTB).
March 28, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, added [1-2] cover letter and [1-3] exhibits (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hertzberger v. Rardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Hertzberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jarid Rardin
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Chad A Blumenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?