Courtelis v. Rosenberg et al
Plaintiff: Kiki Courtelis
Defendant: Kailen Rosenberg and Global Love Mergers, Inc. doing business as Kailen Love and Life Architects
Case Number: 0:2022cv00779
Filed: April 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Devin Driscoll on behalf of Kiki Courtelis. (Driscoll, Devin)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Plaintiff (Hokans, Christian)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY re #16 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Global Love Mergers, Inc., Kailen Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lindell, Justice)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kent Wicker for Kiki Courtelis. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/11/2022. (KMO)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kent Wicker. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9502401 filed by Kiki Courtelis. (Pham, Christopher)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECLARATION of Kent Wicker in Opposition to #16 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Kiki Courtelis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Answer, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B - Notice of Dismissal, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C - Final Award)(Pham, Christopher)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Kiki Courtelis. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pham, Christopher)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Kiki Courtelis. (Pham, Christopher)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D Pham on behalf of Kiki Courtelis. (Pham, Christopher)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Due to the pending motion to dismiss, there is good cause to delay setting a Rule 16 Pretrial Conference at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 4/15/2022.(MSK)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Kailen Rosenberg in SUPPORT OF #16 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Global Love Mergers, Inc., Kailen Rosenberg.(Lindell, Justice)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #16 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Global Love Mergers, Inc., Kailen Rosenberg.(Lindell, Justice)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #16 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Global Love Mergers, Inc., Kailen Rosenberg.(Lindell, Justice)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Global Love Mergers, Inc., Kailen Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lindell, Justice)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #16 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Lindell, Justice)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Global Love Mergers, Inc., Kailen Rosenberg. (Lindell, Justice)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Global Love Mergers, Inc., Kailen Rosenberg. (Lindell, Justice)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Justice Ericson Lindell on behalf of Global Love Mergers, Inc., Kailen Rosenberg. (Lindell, Justice)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Christine Trout Van Tatenhove, D. Barry Stilz, Erin Marie Shaughnessy, J. Kent Wicker and Lynn Sowards Zellen as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Eastern; Case Number 5:20-cv-00220. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per 3rd/4th Stockholders Suits List and referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson.
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: IT IS ORDERED as follows: 1. Defendant's #6 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2. The Clerk of Court is ORDERED to TRANSFER this action to the Federal District Court for the District of Minnesota pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); 3. This matter is stricken from the active docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/31/2022.(KM)cc: COR [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 4/1/2022.]
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by Kiki Courtelis re #7 Notice of Appearance by Christine Trout Van Tatenhove (Van Tatenhove, Christine) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 4/1/2022.]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Global Love Mergers, Inc., Kailen Rosenberg (GLD) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 4/1/2022.]
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Global Love Mergers, Inc., Kailen Rosenberg filed by Global Love Mergers, Inc., Kailen Rosenberg. (Stilz, D.) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 4/1/2022.]
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO J. Kent Wicker re #8 Response in Opposition to Motion: Error: attachment was insufficiently described as Exhibit A. Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachment. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (GLD) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 4/1/2022.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Global Love Mergers, Inc., Kailen Rosenberg filed by Kiki Courtelis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Answer to Arbitration Demand, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wicker, J.) Modified to describe exhibit on 7/8/2020 (GLD). [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 4/1/2022.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eva Christine Trout on behalf of Kiki Courtelis (Trout, Eva) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 4/1/2022.]
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Global Love Mergers, Inc., Kailen Rosenberg (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - LSCM&C Operating Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - LSC.com Operating Agreement, #4 Exhibit 3 - Matchmaking Contract - Redacted, #5 Exhibit 4 - Demand for Arbitration, #6 Exhibit 5 - Demand for Arbitration and Statement of Claims - Redacted, #7 Proposed Order)(Stilz, D.) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 4/1/2022.]
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kiki Courtelis.(Wicker, J.) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 4/1/2022.]
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Global Love Mergers, Inc., Kailen Rosenberg. (Stilz, D.) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 4/1/2022.]
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, D. Barry Stilz. #1 Notice of Removal has been filed by Global Love Mergers, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (GLD) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 4/1/2022.]
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Scott Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-244. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4678221), filed by Kailen Rosenberg, Global Love Mergers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(GLD) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 4/1/2022.]
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (GLD) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 4/1/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Courtelis v. Rosenberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiki Courtelis
Represented By: Christopher D Pham
Represented By: Devin Driscoll
Represented By: Kent Wicker
Represented By: Christian Victor Hokans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kailen Rosenberg
Represented By: Justice Ericson Lindell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Love Mergers, Inc. doing business as Kailen Love and Life Architects
Represented By: Justice Ericson Lindell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?