Barbosa v. Minnesota Wanner et al
Plaintiff: Marcus Barbosa, Sr. and Marcus Barbosa, Sr
Defendant: Minnesota Wanner Company, Altec, Inc., Altec Industries, Inc., Altec Utility Equipment Co, Inc., Minnesota Wanner, Altec, Inc and Altec Industries, Inc
Case Number: 0:2022cv00805
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: John F Docherty
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2022 Filing 16 LETTER from Hennepin County District Court acknowledging receipt of Order of Remand #14 . (MMG)
May 26, 2022 Filing 15 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Hennepin County District Court enclosing #14 Order of Remand. c/c: Hennepin County District Court. (ACH)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 5/26/2022. (KMW) cc: Hennepin County District Court. Modified text on 5/26/2022 (ACH).
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason Eric Robinson for Marcus Barbosa, Sr. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 5/5/2022. (KMO)
May 4, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Marcus Barbosa, Sr. (Zimmerman, Genevieve)
May 4, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason Robinson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9490237 filed by Marcus Barbosa, Sr. (Zimmerman, Genevieve)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 4/28/2022.(TJS)
April 7, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Altec Industries, Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, (Laws, Stephanie)
April 6, 2022 Filing 8 EXHIBIT Notice of Filing/Notice of Removal filed in State Court re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Altec Industries, Inc. (Laws, Stephanie)
April 6, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Altec, Inc, Altec Industries, Inc , Altec Utility Equipment Co, Inc. by Marcus Barbosa, Sr (Zimmerman, Genevieve) Modified text on 4/6/2022 (MTB).
April 6, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Text added: Without Prejudice as to Altec, Inc, Altec Industries, Inc, Altec Utility Equipment Co, Inc. (MTB)
April 5, 2022 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Altec Industries, Inc. (Laws, Stephanie)
April 5, 2022 Filing 5 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 22-cv-805 NEB/JFD. (kt)
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Kyle Farrar as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt)
April 4, 2022 Filing 3 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED//RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Altec Industries, Inc.. (Laws, Stephanie) Modified text on 4/5/2022 (ACH).
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Stephanie M. Laws re #1 Notice of Removal, by Altec Industries, Inc. . (Laws, Stephanie)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number pending (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9425283) filed by Altec Industries, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Laws, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbosa v. Minnesota Wanner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Barbosa, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Barbosa, Sr
Represented By: Genevieve M Zimmerman
Represented By: Jason Eric Robinson
Represented By: Kyle W. Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Wanner Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altec, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altec Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie M Laws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altec Utility Equipment Co, Inc.
Represented By: Nathaniel John Ajouri
Represented By: Stephanie M Laws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Wanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altec, Inc
Represented By: Nathaniel John Ajouri
Represented By: Stephanie M Laws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altec Industries, Inc
Represented By: Nathaniel John Ajouri
Represented By: Stephanie M Laws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?