Pyramex Safety Products, LLC v. Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pyramex Safety Products, LLC
Defendant: Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.
Petitioner: VaGa Sales, Inc. doing business as Blueprint Corporation, The
Case Number: 0:2022cv00814
Filed: April 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER TO ANSWER. Defendant shall file an answer on or before June 10, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 6/3/2022.(TJS)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #76 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert Mark Field for Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 5/17/2022. (KMO)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #75 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael R Marshall for Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 5/17/2022. (KMO)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #74 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Regan S Steepleton for Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 5/17/2022. (KMO)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #69 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard Swor for Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 5/17/2022. (KMO)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #71 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Angela Holt for Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 5/17/2022. (KMO)
May 16, 2022 Filing 76 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert Mark Field. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9515068 filed by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. (Newby, Terrance)
May 16, 2022 Filing 75 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael R. Marshall. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9515036 filed by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. (Newby, Terrance)
May 16, 2022 Filing 74 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Regan S. Steepleton. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9514983 filed by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. (Newby, Terrance)
May 16, 2022 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance C Newby on behalf of Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. (Newby, Terrance)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #70 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jake M Gipson for Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 5/16/2022. (KMO)
May 13, 2022 Filing 71 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Angela Holt. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9510470 filed by Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.. (Huhta, Adam)
May 13, 2022 Filing 70 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jake M Gipson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9510464 filed by Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.. (Huhta, Adam)
May 13, 2022 Filing 69 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard W F Swor. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9510454 filed by Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.. (Huhta, Adam)
May 13, 2022 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S Huhta on behalf of Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.. (Huhta, Adam)
May 6, 2022 Filing 67 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Michael R. Marshall, Regan S Steepleton, Robert Mark Field, David W. Holt, Amanda Turnage, Jake Gipson, and Samuel Lipshie. cc: Michael R. Marshall, Regan S Steepleton, Robert Mark Field, David W. Holt, Amanda Turnage, Jake Gipson, and Samuel Lipshie. (kt)
April 22, 2022 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable 66 . Mail not re-sent to Amanda Turnage, no forwarding address. (KNK) Document QC'd on 5/26/2022 (MTB).
April 5, 2022 Filing 66 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Michael R. Marshall, Regan S Steepleton, Robert Mark Field, David W. Holt, Amanda Turnage, Jake Gipson, and Samuel Lipshie as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt)cc: Michael R. Marshall, Regan S Steepleton, Robert Mark Field, David W. Holt, Amanda Turnage, Jake Gipson, and Samuel Lipshie. (kt)
April 5, 2022 Filing 65 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Western; Case Number 2:20-cv-02751. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez and referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty per 3rd/4th Copyright/Trademark List.
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER FOR IMPROPER VENUE AND TRANSFERRING THE CASE TO THE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 3/30/22. (aah) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 63 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #62 Sealed Response to Motion, filed by Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Excerpts from R.Corcoran Deposition Transcript), #2 Exhibit B (Excerpts from J.Jackson Deposition Transcript), #3 Exhibit C (Screenshot from Amazon.com), #4 Exhibit D (Second Declaration of Craig Wagner))(Lipshie, Samuel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
August 20, 2021 Filing 62 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #61 Corrected MOTION to Change Venue for Improper VenueCorrected MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Marshall, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
August 20, 2021 Filing 61 Corrected MOTION to Change Venue for Improper Venue, Corrected MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Corrected Memorandum), #2 Exhibit 2 (Corrected Declaration))(Lipshie, Samuel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY- - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**]: Defendant moves to correct its memorandum at ECF No. #11 . (ECF No. #59 .) Defendant explains that it made a minor error in its memorandum and in Craig Wagner's declaration. For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Defendant's motion to correct these filings. But to make the record clear, the Court ORDERS Defendant to re-file its Motion to Transfer/Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #10 ) and to attach the corrected memorandum and declaration. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 8/19/2021. (aah) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
August 18, 2021 Filing 59 MOTION to Amend/Correct #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, proposed order submitted by Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Craig Wagner, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Certificate of Consultation)(Lipshie, Samuel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY- - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**]: Defendant moves to correct its memorandum at ECF No. 11. (ECF No. #57 .) The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendant's Motion to Correct Its Memorandum. Defendant failed to include a certificate of consultation as required by Local Rule 7.2. L.R. 7.2 requires counsel to file "a certificate of counsel... affirming that, after consultation between the parties to the controversy, they are unable to reach an accord as to all issues or that all other parties are in agreement with the action requested by the motion. Failure to attach an accompanying certificate of consultation may be deemed good grounds for denying the motion. The certificate must contain the names of participating counsel and the date and manner of consultation. The burden shall be on counsel filing the motion to initiate the conference... If an opposing counsel or party refuses to cooperate in the conduct of a conference, counsel must file a certificate to that effect, setting out counsel's efforts to comply with this rule." Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 8/17/21. (aah) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
August 11, 2021 Filing 57 MOTION to Amend/Correct #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (proposed order submitted) by Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Craig Wagner)(Lipshie, Samuel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY- - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**]: The parties jointly move to reset the jurisdictional discovery deadlines in this case, and they propose suggested deadlines. (ECF No. 55.) The Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART the parties' motion. Specifically, the Court grants the parties' request to extend the deadlines but declines to adopt the parties' suggested dates. Instead, the Court establishes the following updated deadlines for the parties to conduct limited discovery on jurisdiction. The deadline for Defendant's remaining production shall be August 6, 2021. If Plaintiff seeks to supplement its brief in opposition, it must do so by August 20, 2021. And Defendant shall respond by September 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 8/5/2021. (kll) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
August 4, 2021 Filing 55 MOTION Joint Motion and Memorandum of the Parties to Reset the Jurisdictional Discovery and Briefing Deadlines Proposed Order Submitted by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. (Marshall, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 29, 2021 Filing 54 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/29/2021. Counsel for the parties present via telephone. The Court heard from the parties on the progress of resolving the issues in the Motion. The parties announced they have reached an agreement for production. With the consent of the parties the Court will enter an Order denying the Motion as moot. (Plaintiff Counsel: Michael Marshall & Regan Steepleton. Movants Counsel: David Holt. Defendants Counsel: Jake Gipson & Samuel Lipshie.) (Tape #SurfacePro) (cas) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying as moot #33 Motion for Discovery; denying as moot #37 Motion to Compel; denying as moot #38 Motion to Quash. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 7/29/2021. (pcr) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 28, 2021 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 Response to Motion, Decl. of D. Miller filed by VaGa Sales, Inc. d/b/a The Blueprint Corporation. (Holt, David) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 51 Notice of Setting: A Telephonic Status Conference has been set for 7/29/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham. Please dial 877-336-1829 and enter access code 8263358 at least 10 minutes prior to the start of the Conference. *TEXT NOTICE ONLY - THERE IS NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE*(cas) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 26, 2021 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham: Motion Hearing held on 7/26/2021 regarding #33 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Related to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC, #37 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Third Party Subpoena filed by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC and #38 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas to VaGa Sales, Inc. d/b/a The Blueprint Corporation and Kevin Whaley filed by VaGa Sales, Inc. d/b/a The Blueprint Corporation. Counsel for the parties present via Zoom video conference. Attorneys Michael Marshall & Regan Steepleton present for plaintiff. Attorneys Jake Gipson & Samuel Lipshie present for defendant. Attorney David Holt present for third party VaGa Sales. The Court heard argument from counsel. After hearing argument third party VaGa Sales, Inc. and Kevin Whaley are to submit an affidavit to resolve the issues raised in the Motion to Quash. The parties will report to the Court via Telephone Conference on Thursday, 7/29/2021, at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham. (Tape #Zoom.) (cas) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Amend/Correct #33 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Related to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction Amended Certificate of Consultation Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. For good cause shown, Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff's amended certificate of consultation is accepted as filed and the record shall reflect that Defendant opposes Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. (TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 7/20/2021. (pcr) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Setting Hearing on #33 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Related to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC; #37 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Third Party Subpoena by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC; and #38 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas to VaGa Sales, Inc. d/b/a The Blueprint Corporation and Kevin Whaley by VaGa Sales, Inc. d/b/a The Blueprint Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2021 at 10:00 AM via Zoom before Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 7/19/2021. (pcr) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Third Party Subpoena - Proposed Order Submitted filed by Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lipshie, Samuel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #38 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas to VaGa Sales, Inc. d/b/a The Blueprint Corporation and Kevin Whaley Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion to Quash - Proposed Order Submitted filed by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. (Marshall, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Third Party Subpoena - Proposed Order Submitted filed by VaGa Sales, Inc. d/b/a The Blueprint Corporation. (Holt, David) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 15, 2021 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Related to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction proposed order submitted filed by Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - March 19, 2021 Discovery Requests, #2 Exhibit B - April 19, 2021 Objections and Responses, #3 Exhibit C - May 3, 2021 Letter, #4 Exhibit D - May 27, 2021 Letter, #5 Exhibit E - July 1, 2021 Email, #6 Exhibit F - Depo Excerpts, #7 Exhibit G - Decl. of Craig Wagner)(Lipshie, Samuel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 9, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Turnage on behalf of VaGa Sales, Inc. d/b/a The Blueprint Corporation (Turnage, Amanda) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 8, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Holt on behalf of VaGa Sales, Inc. d/b/a The Blueprint Corporation (Holt, David) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS #33 , #36 , #37 , #38 AND STAYING DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 7/7/2021. (kll) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 40 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #38 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas to VaGa Sales, Inc. d/b/a The Blueprint Corporation and Kevin Whaley filed by VaGa Sales, Inc. d/b/a The Blueprint Corporation has been filed. For future reference, please note : Filer failed to indicate in docket text "Proposed Order Submitted" as required by local rules. If no order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 39 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #35 Affidavit of Service filed by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC has been filed. For future reference, please note : Filer failed to indicate in docket text "Proposed Order Submitted" as required by local rules. If no order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 2, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas to VaGa Sales, Inc. d/b/a The Blueprint Corporation and Kevin Whaley by VaGa Sales, Inc. d/b/a The Blueprint Corporation. (Gipson, Jake) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 2, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Third Party Subpoena - Proposed Order Submitted by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Compliance with Third Party Subpoena, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Marshall, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 2, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct #33 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Related to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction Amended Certificate of Consultation Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. (Steepleton, Regan) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 2, 2021 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Testify at Deposition served on Office of James Hurst on July 1, 2021, filed by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. (Steepleton, Regan) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 2, 2021 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Testify at Deposition served on Derek Miller President for Global Glove on May 20, 2021, filed by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. (Steepleton, Regan) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 1, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Related to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Marshall, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
July 1, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition - VaGa Sales Inc. d/b/a The Blueprint Co c/o James A Hurst (Steepleton, Regan) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY- - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**]: Plaintiff moves unopposed to extend the jurisdictional discovery deadlines in this case. (ECF No. 30.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion. The Court establishes the following updated deadlines for the parties to conduct limited discovery on jurisdiction. The deadline for limited discovery shall be July 2, 2021. If Plaintiff seeks to supplement its brief in opposition, it must do so by July 30, 2021. And Defendant shall respond by August 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 5/19/2021. (kll) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Extend Deadline Unopposed Motion and Incorporated Memorandum of Plaintiff for an Extension of the Jurisdictional Discovery Deadlines - Proposed Order Submitted by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. (Marshall, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
May 14, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC Notice of Intent to Serve a Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Testify at Deposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Subpoena)(Steepleton, Regan) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 5/10/2021. (kll) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY- - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**]: The parties jointly move for the Court to enter a protective order to protect the parties confidential information. (ECF No. 26.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the parties motion. The Protective Order shall follow in a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 5/10/2021. (kll) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
May 7, 2021 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Proposed Order Submitted by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order)(Marshall, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
May 4, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jake M Gipson on behalf of Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc. (Gipson, Jake) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
April 30, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Marshall on behalf of Pyramex Safety Products, LLC (Marshall, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
March 19, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC of Discovery Requests to Defendant Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction (Field, Robert) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
March 2, 2021 Filing 22 Minute Entry for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Judge Thomas L. Parker on 3/2/2021. Regan Sherwood appeared for the Plaintiff. Samuel Lipshie and Jack Jaspson appeared for the Defendant. The Court Granted the Plaintiff's Request for limited Discovery as to Defendant's contacts in this jurisdiction. The Court set the following deadlines: Deadline for Limited Discovery due by 5/21/21; Plaintiff's Supplementation to filing due by 6/18/21; and Defendant's Response due by 7/9/21. (Court Reporter, Catherine Phillips) (mlk) Modified on 3/3/2021 (Parker, Thomas). [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] In Plaintiffs Response to the Motion to Change Venue, Plaintiff requested that the Court allow limited discovery on the issue of whether the Court has personal jurisdiction. (ECF No. 15 at PageID 93.) The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs request. Plaintiff shall have through May 21, 2021, to complete limited discovery on Defendants contacts with Tennessee and whether the Court has personal jurisdiction. Further, if Plaintiff seeks to supplement its brief in opposition, it must do so by June 18, 2021. And Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs supplementation by July 9, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 3/2/2021. (kll) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
February 24, 2021 Filing 20 SETTING LETTER - TEXT ONLY, NO IMAGE ATTACHED; Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/2/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Please call 877-336-1839 to dial into the conference call. The access code is 6517215. (mlk) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
February 18, 2021 Filing 19 SETTING LETTER: - TEXT ONLY, NO IMAGE ATTACHED; Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/24/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Please call 877-336-1839 to dial into the conference call. The access code is 6517215. (mlk) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
December 31, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lipshie, Samuel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] Defendant moves unopposed for an extension of time to reply to Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to the Motion to Change Venue or in the alternative, Motion to Dismiss. (ECF No. 16.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Defendants motion. Defendant shall have through December 31, 2020 to reply. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 12/18/2020. (kll) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
December 18, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, #10 MOTION to Change Venue for Improper Venue MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Lack of Personal Jurisdiction , MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certificate of Consultation))(Lipshie, Samuel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
December 11, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Change Venue for Improper Venue MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Joshua Jackson)(Field, Robert) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] Plaintiff moves for an extension of time to respond to Defendants motion to transfer, or alternatively, motion to dismiss. (ECF No. 13.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs motion. Plaintiff shall have through December 11, 2020 to respond to Defendants motion. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 11/30/2020. (kll) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
November 25, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Change Venue for Improper Venue MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (proposed order submitted) by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation)(Sherwood, Regan) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
November 24, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC as to Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.. (Sherwood, Regan) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Change Venue for Improper Venue MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Craig Wagner)(Lipshie, Samuel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Change Venue for Improper Venue, MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.. (Lipshie, Samuel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. (Sherwood, Regan) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Regan S Sherwood on behalf of Pyramex Safety Products, LLC (Sherwood, Regan) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT For Damages and Other Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3454006), filed by Pyramex Safety Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Field, Robert) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 4452526; 6134301; . (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Field, Robert) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 4/5/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pyramex Safety Products, LLC v. Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pyramex Safety Products, LLC
Represented By: Michael R Marshall
Represented By: Nathaniel John Ajouri
Represented By: Regan S Steepleton
Represented By: Robert Mark Field
Represented By: Terrance C Newby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Glove & Safety Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Adam S Huhta
Represented By: Angela Holt
Represented By: Jake M Gipson
Represented By: Richard Swor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VaGa Sales, Inc. doing business as Blueprint Corporation, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?