United States of America v. Byers et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Ronald E. Byers, Deanna L. Byers and Hennepin County, Minnesota
Case Number: 0:2022cv01225
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
2 Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2022 at 11:00 AM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ronald E. Byers. (Iliff, Todd)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Deanna L. Byers. (Iliff, Todd)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Ronald E. Byers. (Iliff, Todd)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Deanna L. Byers. (Iliff, Todd)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Ronald E. Byers. (Iliff, Todd)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Deanna L. Byers. (Iliff, Todd)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER on #14 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/22/2022. (EB)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Stipulation. (Kirby, Elizabeth)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Hennepin County, Minnesota. (Kirby, Elizabeth)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Hennepin County, Minnesota. (Bruggeman, Sara)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara L Bruggeman on behalf of Hennepin County, Minnesota. (Bruggeman, Sara)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text-Only) ORDER on #9 Stipulation. The time for Defendant Ronald E. Byers to answer Plaintiff's Complaint is extended from June 3, 2022 to June 23, 2022. Said extension shall not affect any of the other dates set in the case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/6/2022. (HAM)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re extension of time for Def. Ronald Byers to Answer Complaint #9 Stipulation. (Johnson, Dennis)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION to extend time for R. Byers to answer complaint by Deanna L. Byers, Ronald E. Byers. (Johnson, Dennis)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis B Johnson on behalf of Deanna L. Byers, Ronald E. Byers. (Johnson, Dennis)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States of America. Hennepin County, Minnesota waiver sent on 5/11/2022, answer due 7/11/2022. (Kirby, Elizabeth)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Deanna L. Byers served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. (Kirby, Elizabeth)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Ronald E. Byers served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. (Kirby, Elizabeth)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Katherine M. Menendez recused. Case reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 22-cv-1225 PJS/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/6/2022.(kt)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Deanna L. Byers, Ronald E. Byers, Hennepin County, Minnesota. (MTB)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per Civil (3rd, 4th - Federal Tax Suits) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-01225 KMM/TNL.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MTB)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kirby, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Byers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Elizabeth Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald E. Byers
Represented By: Todd R Iliff
Represented By: Dennis B Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna L. Byers
Represented By: Todd R Iliff
Represented By: Dennis B Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennepin County, Minnesota
Represented By: Sara L Bruggeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?