Johnson v. MCF - St. Cloud
Plaintiff: Eugene Laron Johnson
Defendant: MCF - St. Cloud, S. Holzapfel and A. Zamora
Case Number: 0:2022cv01299
Filed: May 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/30/2022. (JRS)
June 23, 2022 Filing 12 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Eugene Laron Johnson. (MMG)
June 23, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against S. Holzapfel, MCF - St. Cloud, A. Zamora. filed by Eugene Laron Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Attachment, #2 Envelope) (MMG)
June 6, 2022 Filing 10 LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from Eugene Laron Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(ACH)
June 6, 2022 Filing 9 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Eugene Laron Johnson. cc: Johnson with copy of blank complaint, IFP, and order #5 .(MMG) Modified text on 6/6/2022 (MMG).
June 3, 2022 Filing 8 LETTER to the Clerk's Office/Request from Eugene Laron Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(MMG)
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 LETTER TO THE COURT from Eugene Laron Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(MMG)
June 2, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Eugene Laron Johnson - Address has been updated on the docket to MCF - Moose Lake, 1000 Lakeshore Drive, Moose Lake, MN 55767 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/25/2022. (JRS)
May 20, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER to Court from Eugene Laron Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(MKB) Document QC'd on 6/30/2022 (MTB).
May 20, 2022 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Eugene Laron Johnson. (MKB) Document QC'd on 6/30/2022 (MTB).
May 13, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Eugene Laron Johnson (JGK)
May 13, 2022 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against MCF - St. Cloud filed by Eugene Laron Johnson. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 5/18/2022 (ABR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. MCF - St. Cloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Laron Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCF - St. Cloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Holzapfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?