United States of America v. Pashina et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Thomas J. Pashina, Jane R. Pashina, Midland Funding, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 0:2022cv01512
Filed: June 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Filing 31 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Midland Funding, LLC (MMP)
July 29, 2022 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #28 Application for Entry of Default, #29 Declaration (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
July 29, 2022 Filing 29 DECLARATION of LaQuita Taylor-Phillips re #28 Application for Entry of Default by United States of America . (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
July 29, 2022 Filing 28 APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Defendant Midland Funding, LLC. (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
July 28, 2022 Filing 27 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMP)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER APPROVING THE UNITED STATES AND DEFENDANT PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION STIPULATION TO JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 7/28/2022. (KMW)
July 27, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Pfutzenreuter on behalf of Jane R. Pashina, Thomas J. Pashina. (Pfutzenreuter, Kathleen)
July 25, 2022 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Stipulation to Judgment between United States of America and PHH Mortgage Corporation #23 Stipulation. (Fulton, William)
July 25, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION to Judgment between United States of America and PHH Mortgage Corporation by PHH Mortgage Corporation. Jointly Signed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fulton, William)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. PHH Mortgage Corporation answer due 7/29/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/15/2022. (HAM)
July 15, 2022 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Fulton, William)
July 15, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fulton, William)
July 8, 2022 Filing 19 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jane R. Pashina, Thomas J. Pashina. (MKB)
July 7, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #16 Application for Entry of Default, #17 Declaration (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
July 7, 2022 Filing 17 DECLARATION of LaQuita Taylor-Phillips re #16 Application for Entry of Default by United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Status Report, #2 Exhibit B - Status Report)(Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
July 7, 2022 Filing 16 APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Defendants Thomas J. and Jane R. Pashina. (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
July 7, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Hansen, Brian)
June 30, 2022 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Hansen, Brian)
June 30, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PHH Mortgage Corporation re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , #11 Proposed Order to Judge - Other (Hansen, Brian)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. PHH Mortgage Corporation answer due 7/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/30/2022. (HAM)
June 30, 2022 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Answer and otherwise respond to Complaint #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Hansen, Brian)
June 30, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Hansen, Brian)
June 16, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Jane R. Pashina served on 6/13/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
June 16, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Thomas J. Pashina served on 6/13/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
June 10, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. PHH Mortgage Corporation served on 6/10/2022, answer due 7/1/2022. (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
June 10, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Midland Funding, LLC served on 6/10/2022, answer due 7/1/2022. (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
June 8, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Midland Funding, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Jane R. Pashina, Thomas J. Pashina. (MMP)
June 8, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by United States of America. Filer requests summons issued. (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
June 7, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Midland Funding, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Jane R. Pashina, Thomas J. Pashina. (ACH)
June 7, 2022 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Federal Tax Suits) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-1512 NEB/TNL.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
June 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Pashina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: LaQuita Taylor-Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Pashina
Represented By: Kathleen Pfutzenreuter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane R. Pashina
Represented By: Kathleen Pfutzenreuter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: William S Fulton, Jr
Represented By: Brian Michael Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?