Timeless Bar, Inc. et al v. Illinois Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Timeless Bar, Inc. doing business as Press Bar and Parlor, The, Horseshoe Club, LLC and Jessie Welsh
Defendant: Illinois Casualty Company
Case Number: 0:2022cv01685
Filed: June 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #28 Stipulation. (Bergstrom, Adina)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Horseshoe Club, LLC, Timeless Bar, Inc., Jessie Welsh. Jointly Signed by Illinois Casualty Company. (Bergstrom, Adina)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Horseshoe Club, LLC, Timeless Bar, Inc., Jessie Welsh. Jointly Signed by Illinois Casualty Company.(Bergstrom, Adina)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Reply to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Jessie Welsh filed by Illinois Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Certificate of Word Count Compliance)(Prouty, Beth)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Amended ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint (Second) filed by Illinois Casualty Company. (Prouty, Beth)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Jessie Welsh filed by Horseshoe Club, LLC, Timeless Bar, Inc., Jessie Welsh.(Bergstrom, Adina)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DECLARATION of Adina R. Bergstrom in Opposition to #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Jessie Welsh filed by Horseshoe Club, LLC, Timeless Bar, Inc., Jessie Welsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-5)(Bergstrom, Adina)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Jessie Welsh filed by Horseshoe Club, LLC, Timeless Bar, Inc., Jessie Welsh. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bergstrom, Adina)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Illinois Casualty Company. (Prouty, Beth)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint filed by Illinois Casualty Company. (Prouty, Beth)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: After Defendant filed the pending motion to dismiss #11 , Plaintiffs submitted a Second Amended Complaint #17 in response to the Court's Order dated 7/18/2022 addressing the allegations of diversity of citizenship #8 . Having reviewed the pleadings and the Defendant's motion and to avoid any confusion, the Court finds that the motion to dismiss should be treated as a motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. See Cartier v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., 547 F. App'x 800, 803-04 (8th Cir. 2013) (noting it is within a district courts discretion to treat a motion to dismiss the original complaint as a motion to dismiss the amended complaint). The Plaintiffs' response to the motion to dismiss and Defendant's reply shall be filed in accordance with the deadlines established under D. Minn. LR 7.1(c)(2) & (c)(3). Ordered by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/26/2022. (BJP)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Illinois Casualty Company. filed by Timeless Bar, Inc., Jessie Welsh, Horseshoe Club, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Bergstrom, Adina)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #11 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Illinois Casualty Company.(Prouty, Beth)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Jessie Welsh filed by Illinois Casualty Company.(Prouty, Beth)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Beth A. Jenson Prouty in SUPPORT OF #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Jessie Welsh filed by Illinois Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3)(Prouty, Beth)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Jessie Welsh filed by Illinois Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Word Count Compliance)(Prouty, Beth)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Jessie Welsh : Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Prouty, Beth)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Jessie Welsh filed by Illinois Casualty Company. (Prouty, Beth)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint filed by Illinois Casualty Company. (FILED IN ERROR, WILL BE REFILED Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3) (Prouty, Beth) Modified text on 7/19/2022 (KNK).
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth A Jenson Prouty on behalf of Illinois Casualty Company. (Prouty, Beth)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT: Within 7 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiffs shall file a Second Amended Complaint adequately alleging the citizenship of all parties. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/18/2022. (BJP)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Horseshoe Club, LLC. (Bergstrom, Adina)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Timeless Bar, Inc.. (Bergstrom, Adina)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Illinois Casualty Company. filed by Timeless Bar, Inc., Jessie Welsh, Horseshoe Club, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Bergstrom, Adina)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Illinois Casualty Company. (MTB)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per Civil (6th Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 22-cv-01685 KMM/LIB.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MTB)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adina R Bergstrom on behalf of Horseshoe Club, LLC, Timeless Bar, Inc., Jessie Welsh. (Bergstrom, Adina) Modified text on 6/29/2022 (MTB).
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Illinois Casualty Company (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9605696) filed by Timeless Bar, Inc., Jessie Welsh, Horseshoe Club, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bergstrom, Adina) Modified text on 6/29/2022 (MTB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timeless Bar, Inc. et al v. Illinois Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timeless Bar, Inc. doing business as Press Bar and Parlor, The
Represented By: Adina R Bergstrom
Represented By: Brenda M Sauro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horseshoe Club, LLC
Represented By: Adina R Bergstrom
Represented By: Brenda M Sauro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Welsh
Represented By: Adina R Bergstrom
Represented By: Brenda M Sauro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Casualty Company
Represented By: Beth A Jenson Prouty
Represented By: Timothy J Carrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?