Silbernagel v. Westfield Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Nathan Wayne Silbernagel
Defendant: Westfield Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2022cv01979
Filed: August 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2022 *** Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/1/2022 at 09:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. (JME)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/1/2022 at 09:00 AM via Zoom audio (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 12/1/2022. Fact Discovery due by 5/26/2023. Expert Discovery due by 8/26/2023. Motions (non-disp) due 5/26/2023. Motions (disp) due by 10/26/2023. Ready for trial due by 1/26/2024. Additional Status Conferences set for 11/1/22 at 9:00 AM, 12/1/2022 at 09:00 AM; 1/4/2023 at 10:30 AM; 2/2/2023 at 09:00 AM; 3/3/2023 at 10:30 AM; 4/3/2023 at 09:00 AM via Zoom audio (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 10/6/2022.(MTB) Modified text on 10/7/2022 (JME).
October 4, 2022 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/4/2022. (MTB)
September 28, 2022 Filing 13 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing David C. Pagel, Valerie Narcy as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (ABR)
September 27, 2022 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Westfield Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Nathan Wayne Silbernagel.(Campbell, Stuart) Modified text on 9/28/2022 (ABR).
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/27/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2022 at 01:00 PM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 9/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Rule 26 Form)(MME)
August 22, 2022 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Westfield Insurance Company. (Campbell, Stuart) Modified text on 9/1/2022 (ACH).
August 22, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE by Westfield Insurance Company First Amended Notice of Removal (Campbell, Stuart)
August 22, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart D. Campbell on behalf of Westfield Insurance Company. (Campbell, Stuart)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #1 Notice of Removal. See Order for details and deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 8/17/2022. (JLD)
August 10, 2022 Filing 6 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing David C. Pagel as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMG)
August 10, 2022 Filing 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 22-cv-1979 JRT/JFD.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMG)
August 9, 2022 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Westfield Insurance Company. (Wood, Brian)
August 9, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Wood, Brian)
August 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9687089) filed by Westfield Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wood, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silbernagel v. Westfield Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Wayne Silbernagel
Represented By: L Michael Hall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian A Wood
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?