Wiss et al v. Proctor Independent School District 704 et al
Plaintiff: Tyler P. Wiss and Melody M. McKenna
Defendant: Proctor Independent School District 704, Derek B. Parendo, John Doe Assistant Coaches #1-5 and John E. Engelking
Case Number: 0:2022cv02047
Filed: August 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Sex/Blindness Discrimination in Educational Programs
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER on #15 Stipulation. Derek B. Parendo answer due 10/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/29/2022.(JLB)
September 28, 2022 Filing 18 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 Stipulation. (Pattee, Steven) Modified text on 9/28/2022 (CLK).
September 28, 2022 Filing 17 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Answer the Complaint by Derek B. Parendo. Jointly Signed by Tyler P. Wiss and Melody M. McKenna. (Pattee, Steven) Modified text on 9/28/2022 (CLK).
September 28, 2022 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Stipulation,. (Fredrickson, Mark)
September 28, 2022 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #5 Amended Complaint, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT DEREK B. PARENDO TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' AMEMDED COMPLAINT by John E. Engelking, Derek B. Parendo, Proctor Independent School District 704. Jointly Signed by Tyler P. Wiss and Melody M. McKenna. (Fredrickson, Mark)
September 28, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D Pattee on behalf of Derek B. Parendo. (Pattee, Steven)
September 28, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A Fredrickson on behalf of Derek B. Parendo. (Fredrickson, Mark)
September 20, 2022 Filing 12 Joint ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by John E. Engelking, Proctor Independent School District 704. (Ivan, Alex) Modified text on 9/29/2022 (ACH).
September 20, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex D. Ivan on behalf of John E. Engelking, Proctor Independent School District 704. (Ivan, Alex)
September 20, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mar-Bon R Wallner on behalf of John E. Engelking, Proctor Independent School District 704. (Wallner, Mar-Bon)
September 13, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melody M. McKenna, Tyler P. Wiss re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Olson, Stephen)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nathan M. Cockerham for Melody M. McKenna and Tyler P. Wiss. Signed by Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 9/2/2022. (KMO)
September 6, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melody M. McKenna, Tyler P. Wiss (Olson, Stephen)
September 2, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nathan M. Cockerham. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9738194 filed by Melody M. McKenna, Tyler P. Wiss. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Olson, Stephen)
September 1, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John E. Engelking, John Doe Assistant Coaches #1-5, Derek B. Parendo, Proctor Independent School District 704. filed by Tyler P. Wiss, Melody M. McKenna. No summons requested. (Olson, Stephen)
August 30, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melody M. McKenna, Tyler P. Wiss re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Olson, Stephen)
August 19, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John E. Engelking, John Doe Assistant Coaches #1-5, Derek B. Parendo, Proctor Independent School District 704. (ACH)
August 19, 2022 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (5th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 22-cv-2047 PJS/LIB.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
August 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John E Engelking, John Doe Assistant Coaches #1-5, Derek B Parendo, Proctor Independent School District #704 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9710274) filed by Tyler Wiss, Melody McKenna. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olson, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiss et al v. Proctor Independent School District 704 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler P. Wiss
Represented By: Stephen J Olson
Represented By: Nathan M. Cockerham, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody M. McKenna
Represented By: Stephen J Olson
Represented By: Nathan M. Cockerham, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proctor Independent School District 704
Represented By: Alex D. Ivan
Represented By: Mar-Bon R Wallner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek B. Parendo
Represented By: Mark A Fredrickson
Represented By: Steven D Pattee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Assistant Coaches #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Engelking
Represented By: Alex D. Ivan
Represented By: Mar-Bon R Wallner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?