Ruettimann et al v. American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation et al
Defendant: Deanna Ruettimann, Patrick Ruettimann, American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation and Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2022cv02130
Filed: August 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #16 Stipulation. (Dobie, Kevin)
October 28, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation. Jointly Signed by Deanna Ruettimann, Patrick Ruettimann, and Dovenmuehle Mortgage Inc.. (Dobie, Kevin)
October 28, 2022 Filing 15 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR//STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation. Jointly Signed by Deanna Ruettimann, Patrick Ruettimann, and Dovenmuehle Mortgage Inc.. (Dobie, Kevin) Modified text on 10/28/2022 (ACH).
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on #10 Stipulation. Defendants have up to and including October 28, 2022, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/16/2022.(TMA)
September 16, 2022 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation. (Dobie, Kevin)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James V Noonan for American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Pamela J Leichtling for American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/16/2022. (KMO)
September 15, 2022 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Dobie, Kevin)
September 15, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation. Jointly Signed by Deanna Ruettimann, Patrick Ruettimann, and Dovenmuehle Mortgage Inc.. (Dobie, Kevin)
September 15, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Pamela J. Leichtling. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9761971 filed by American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation. (Dobie, Kevin)
September 15, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James V. Noonan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9761938 filed by American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation. (Dobie, Kevin)
September 15, 2022 Filing 7 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation. (Dobie, Kevin) Modified text on 9/16/2022 (MMP).
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on #3 Stipulation. American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation response due 9/22/2022; Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc. response due 9/22/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/2/2022.(TMA)
September 1, 2022 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc.. (Sauer, Michael)
September 1, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 Stipulation. (Dobie, Kevin)
September 1, 2022 Filing 3 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation. Jointly Signed by Deanna Ruettimann, Patrick Ruettimann, and Dovenmuehle Mortgage Inc.. (Dobie, Kevin)
August 31, 2022 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 22-cv-2130 (NEB/ECW).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB)
August 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County Fourth Judicial District, case number Not available (filing fee $ 402, receipt number BMNDC-9731808) filed by Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc., American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service) (Dobie, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruettimann et al v. American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Ruettimann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Ruettimann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Portfolio Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Kevin T Dobie
Represented By: James V Noonan
Represented By: Pamela J Leichtling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?