Idle Hands Enterprises, LLC v. No Coast Tattoo, LLC
Plaintiff: Idle Hands Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: No Coast Tattoo, LLC
Case Number: 0:2022cv02186
Filed: September 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Idle Hands Enterprises, LLC. No Coast Tattoo, LLC served on 9/9/2022, answer due 9/30/2022. (Stock, Robert)
September 20, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Stock, Robert)
September 8, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to No Coast Tattoo, LLC. (ABR)
September 8, 2022 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per Civil (6th - Copyright, Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 22-cv-2186 (KMM/LIB).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR)
September 8, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against No Coast Tattoo, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9746711) filed by Idle Hands Enterprises, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Registration Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s) B - MN Secretary of State's filing records, #3 Exhibit(s) C - No Coast Tattoo Website Homepage, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Screenshot of the NO COAST Tattoo Facebook Page, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Stock, Robert)
September 8, 2022 Filing 1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - COMPLAINT against No Coast Tattoo, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9746227) filed by Idle Hands Enterprises, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) (Stock, Robert) Modified text on 9/8/2022 (ABR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Idle Hands Enterprises, LLC v. No Coast Tattoo, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idle Hands Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Robert B Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No Coast Tattoo, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?