Svendsen v. Minten et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Roy Svendsen
Defendant: Pamela J. Minten, Mikel B. Olson and Fergus Falls HRA
Case Number: 0:2022cv02667
Filed: October 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2022 Filing 24 (Text-Only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: The Court will rule on the Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction on the paper submissions. (KMW)
December 14, 2022 Filing 23 Declaration of Stephen R. Svendsen in Support of #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Stephen Roy Svendsen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s))(Svendsen, Stephen)
December 14, 2022 Filing 22 Declaration of Stephen R. Svendsen in Support of #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Stephen Roy Svendsen.(Svendsen, Stephen)
December 14, 2022 Filing 21 REPLY re #14 Memorandum in Support of Motion, For TRO filed by Stephen Roy Svendsen. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Svendsen, Stephen)
December 9, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Fergus Falls HRA, Pamela J. Minten, Mikel B. Olson. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Declaration of Pamela Minten, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Svendsen's Lease executed on 12-03-2020, #4 Exhibit(s) B - Amended Notice of Non-Renewal provided to Svendsen on 09-27-2022)(Stock, Robert)
December 2, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #11 Summons Returned Executed, Waiver of Service Executed: The waiver of service was served on 11/4/2022 for all defendants and the answer date is 01/03/2023 for all defendants. (ACH)
November 28, 2022 Filing 19 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing MacKenzie L. Hertz as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (ACH)
November 27, 2022 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Stephen Roy Svendsen.(Svendsen, Stephen)
November 27, 2022 Filing 17 Declaration of Stephen R. Svendsen in Support of #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Stephen Roy Svendsen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s))(Svendsen, Stephen)
November 27, 2022 Filing 16 Declaration of Stephen R. Svendsen in Support of #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Stephen Roy Svendsen.(Svendsen, Stephen)
November 27, 2022 Filing 15 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #12 Motion for TRO,, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Stephen Roy Svendsen.(Svendsen, Stephen)
November 27, 2022 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Stephen Roy Svendsen. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Svendsen, Stephen)
November 27, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Date and time to be determined. (Svendsen, Stephen)
November 27, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Stephen Roy Svendsen. (Svendsen, Stephen)
November 23, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Fergus Falls HRA; Mikel B. Olson; Pamela J. Minten; Waiver sent on 11/4/2022, answer due 01/03/2023. (Stock, Robert) Modified text on 12/2/2022 (ACH).
November 23, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B Stock on behalf of All Defendants. (Stock, Robert)
November 16, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Fergus Falls HRA served on 11/15/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (ACH) Document QC'd on 12/6/2022 (ABR).
November 4, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Fergus Falls HRA. (ACH)
November 4, 2022 Filing 7 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. REISSUED//Summons Issued as to Fergus Falls HRA. (ACH) Modified text on 11/4/2022 (ACH).
November 4, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service for Defendants Pamela J. Minten and Mikel B. Olson. Documents have been mailed to all listed defendants: Order Granting IFP, Complaint, two Waiver of Services (AO 399), and one Prepaid Envelope. Waiver of Service due by 12/5/2022. (ACH)
November 4, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #7 Summons Issued: Document filed in error. Reissued Summons, see docket #8 . (ACH)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/3/2022. (JLB)
October 25, 2022 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Stephen Roy Svendsen is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Stephen Roy Svendsen has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (JGK)
October 25, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Pamela J. Minten, Mikel B. Olson, Fergus Falls HRA filed by Stephen Roy Svendsen. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (6th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B - Part I, #4 Exhibit(s) B - Part II, #5 Exhibit(s) C, #6 Exhibit(s) D, #7 Exhibit(s) E, #8 Exhibit(s) F, #9 Exhibit(s) G, #10 Exhibit(s) P, #11 List of Filed Documents, #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACH) Modified text on 10/25/2022 (MKB). Document QC'd on 11/1/2022 (ACH).
October 25, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Stephen Roy Svendsen. (ACH) Document QC'd on 11/1/2022 (ACH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Svendsen v. Minten et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Roy Svendsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela J. Minten
Represented By: Robert B Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikel B. Olson
Represented By: Robert B Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fergus Falls HRA
Represented By: Robert B Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?