State of Minnesota v. Fleet Farm LLC et al
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota by its Attorney General, Keith Ellison and State of Minnesota
Defendant: Fleet Farm LLC, Fleet Farm Group LLC, Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC, Mills Fleet Farm LLC, Mills Fleet Farm Group LLC and Fleet Wholesale Supply Co. LLC
Case Number: 0:2022cv02694
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #26 Letter to District Judge, #24 Letter to District Judge, #18 Motion to Dismiss/General. The request to stay briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. The Court will hear argument on both motions at the hearing set on 1/11/2023. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2023 at 02:00 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge John R. Tunheim. Ordered by Judge John R. Tunheim on 12/15/2022.(HMA)
December 14, 2022 Filing 30 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2023 at 02:00 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge John R. Tunheim. (Maloney, Eric)
December 14, 2022 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Eric J. Maloney in Opposition to #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by State of Minnesota.(Maloney, Eric)
December 14, 2022 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Maloney, Eric)
December 9, 2022 Filing 27 REPLY re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Moerke, Katherine)
November 30, 2022 Filing 26 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Fleet Farm Group LLC, Fleet Farm LLC, Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC Responding to Plaintiff's November 23, 2022 Letter Requesting a Stay. (Noteboom, Todd)
November 28, 2022 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Fleet Farm Group LLC, Fleet Farm LLC, Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Noteboom, Todd)
November 23, 2022 Filing 24 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by State of Minnesota Requesting a Stay of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Maloney, Eric)
November 23, 2022 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Fleet Farm Group LLC, Fleet Farm LLC, Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC.(Noteboom, Todd)
November 23, 2022 Filing 22 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #18 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Fleet Farm Group LLC, Fleet Farm LLC, Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC.(Noteboom, Todd)
November 23, 2022 Filing 21 Declaration of Andrew W. Davis in Support of #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Fleet Farm Group LLC, Fleet Farm LLC, Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - ATF Form 4473, #2 Exhibit(s) B - ATF Form 3310.4)(Noteboom, Todd)
November 23, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Fleet Farm Group LLC, Fleet Farm LLC, Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Noteboom, Todd)
November 23, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Noteboom, Todd)
November 23, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Fleet Farm Group LLC, Fleet Farm LLC, Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC. (Noteboom, Todd)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Due to the pending Motion to Remand to State Court #12 , the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. The Court will schedule a pretrial conference, if needed, promptly after a decision is issued on the pending motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 11/8/2022. (ALM)
November 7, 2022 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by State of Minnesota.(Maloney, Eric)
November 7, 2022 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Maloney, Eric)
November 7, 2022 Filing 14 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #12 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by State of Minnesota.(Maloney, Eric)
November 7, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Date and time to be determined. (Maloney, Eric)
November 7, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by State of Minnesota. (Maloney, Eric)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on #9 Stipulation to Extend the Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Fleet Farm Group LLC answer due 11/23/2022; Fleet Farm LLC answer due 11/23/2022; Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC answer due 11/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 11/1/2022.(MTB)
November 1, 2022 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Davis, Andrew)
November 1, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend the Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Fleet Farm Group LLC, Fleet Farm LLC, Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC. Jointly Signed by State of Minnesota. (Davis, Andrew)
October 28, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Leiendecker on behalf of Fleet Farm Group LLC, Fleet Farm LLC, Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC. (Leiendecker, Andrew)
October 28, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Robin Markowitz on behalf of Fleet Farm Group LLC, Fleet Farm LLC, Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC. (Markowitz, Sharon)
October 28, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W Davis on behalf of Fleet Farm Group LLC, Fleet Farm LLC, Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC. (Davis, Andrew)
October 27, 2022 Filing 5 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 22-cv-2694 (JRT/JFD).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (KNK)
October 26, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fleet Farm Group LLC, Fleet Farm LLC, Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC re #2 Declaration,,,, #1 Notice of Removal,,,, #3 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Davis, Andrew)
October 26, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Fleet Farm Group LLC, Fleet Farm LLC, Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC. (Noteboom, Todd) Modified text on 10/27/2022 (MKB).
October 26, 2022 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Andrew W. Davis re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, by Fleet Farm Group LLC, Fleet Farm LLC, Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Washington AGO 1.23.20 Press Release, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Washington AGO 3.9.20 Press Release, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - DC AGO 12.17.20 Press Release, #4 Exhibit(s) 4 - 2.25.21 Letter re 3D Guns, #5 Exhibit(s) 5 - 8.20.21 Pennsylvania AGO letter to U.S. AGO, #6 Exhibit(s) 6 - 7.11.22 Minnesota AGO Press Release, #7 Exhibit(s) 7 - 2014 Firearms Sourced and Recovered by State, #8 Exhibit(s) 8 - 2015 Firearms Sourced and Recovered by State, #9 Exhibit(s) 9 - 2016 Firearms Sourced and Recovered by State, #10 Exhibit(s) 10 - 2017 Firearms Sourced and Recovered by State, #11 Exhibit(s) 11 - 2018 Firearms Sourced and Recovered by State, #12 Exhibit(s) 12 - 2019 Firearms Sourced and Recovered by State, #13 Exhibit(s) 13 - 2020 Firearms Sourced and Recovered by State, #14 Exhibit(s) 14 - 2021 Firearms Sourced and Recovered by State)(Noteboom, Todd)
October 26, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-cv-22-14473 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9853080) filed by Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC, Fleet Farm Group LLC, Fleet Farm LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Civil Cover Sheet (state court), #3 Exhibit(s) C - Summons - Fleet Farm LLC, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Summons - Fleet Farm Group LLC, #5 Exhibit(s) E -Summons Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC, #6 Exhibit(s) F - Notice of Judicial Assignment, #7 Exhibit(s) G - Affidavit of Service - Fleet Farm LLC, #8 Exhibit(s) H - Affidavit of Service - Fleet Farm Group LLC, #9 Exhibit(s) I - Affidavit of Service - Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC, #10 Exhibit(s) J - Notice of Appearance, #11 Exhibit(s) K - Notice to Remove Judicial Officer, #12 Exhibit(s) L - Notice of Case Reassignment, #13 Exhibit(s) M - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #14 Civil Cover Sheet) (Noteboom, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Minnesota v. Fleet Farm LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota by its Attorney General, Keith Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Eric John Maloney
Represented By: Jason T Pleggenkuhle
Represented By: Katherine A. Moerke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleet Farm LLC
Represented By: Todd A Noteboom
Represented By: Andrew W Davis
Represented By: Andrew Leiendecker
Represented By: Sharon Robin Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleet Farm Group LLC
Represented By: Todd A Noteboom
Represented By: Andrew W Davis
Represented By: Andrew Leiendecker
Represented By: Sharon Robin Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleet Farm Wholesale Supply Co. LLC
Represented By: Todd A Noteboom
Represented By: Andrew W Davis
Represented By: Andrew Leiendecker
Represented By: Sharon Robin Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mills Fleet Farm LLC
Represented By: Andrew W Davis
Represented By: Andrew Leiendecker
Represented By: Sharon Robin Markowitz
Represented By: Todd A Noteboom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mills Fleet Farm Group LLC
Represented By: Andrew W Davis
Represented By: Andrew Leiendecker
Represented By: Sharon Robin Markowitz
Represented By: Todd A Noteboom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleet Wholesale Supply Co. LLC
Represented By: Andrew W Davis
Represented By: Andrew Leiendecker
Represented By: Sharon Robin Markowitz
Represented By: Todd A Noteboom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?