Malark Enterprises, Inc. v. Malark et al
Plaintiff: Malark Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Douglas J. Malark, Malark Companies, LLC and Malark Companies LLC
Case Number: 0:2022cv02789
Filed: November 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Filing 26 Redacted Document for #7 , #17 Sealed Declaration of Amy Phillips filed by Malark Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit G)(Jorgenson, Jade)
November 18, 2022 Filing 25 Redacted Document for #6 Sealed Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order filed by Malark Enterprises, Inc..(Jorgenson, Jade)
November 18, 2022 Filing 24 Redacted Document for #1 Sealed Complaint . (Jorgenson, Jade)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Stipulation to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Without Prejudice and Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/17/2022. (KAT)
November 17, 2022 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #21 Stipulation. (Jorgenson, Jade)
November 17, 2022 Filing 21 STIPULATION re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Malark Enterprises, Inc.. Jointly Signed by MALARK ENTERPRISES, INC., DOUGLAS J. MALARK, and MALARK COMPANIES LLC. (Jorgenson, Jade)
November 17, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathy Sue Kimmel on behalf of Douglas J. Malark, Malark Companies LLC. (Kimmel, Kathy)
November 3, 2022 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Malark Enterprises, Inc. re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #13 Proposed Order to Judge, #12 Statement instead of Redacted Document - Entire Document Confidential/Impracticable to Redact, #7 Declaration in Support, #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #10 Declaration in Support, #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion Upon Malark Companies, LLC (Jorgenson, Jade)
November 3, 2022 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Malark Enterprises, Inc. re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #13 Proposed Order to Judge, #12 Statement instead of Redacted Document - Entire Document Confidential/Impracticable to Redact, #7 Declaration in Support, #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #10 Declaration in Support, #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion Upon Douglas J. Malark (Jorgenson, Jade)
November 2, 2022 Filing 17 EXHIBIT Exhibit G re #7 Declaration in Support filed by Malark Enterprises, Inc..(Rondoni Tavernier, Anne)
November 2, 2022 Filing 16 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Rondoni Tavernier, Anne)
November 2, 2022 Filing 15 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Rondoni Tavernier, Anne)
November 2, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Date and time to be determined. (Rondoni Tavernier, Anne)
November 2, 2022 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Malark Enterprises, Inc..(Rondoni Tavernier, Anne)
November 2, 2022 Filing 12 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #11 Sealed Document(s) - #11 Sealed Exhibit F filed by Malark Enterprises, Inc..(Rondoni Tavernier, Anne)
November 2, 2022 Filing 11 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit F re #10 Declaration in Support filed by Malark Enterprises, Inc..(Rondoni Tavernier, Anne)
November 2, 2022 Filing 10 Declaration of Joseph J. Cassioppi in Support of #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Malark Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A - E)(Rondoni Tavernier, Anne)
November 2, 2022 Filing 9 Redacted Document for #8 Sealed Exhibit F filed by Malark Enterprises, Inc..(Rondoni Tavernier, Anne)
November 2, 2022 Filing 8 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit F re #7 Declaration in Support filed by Malark Enterprises, Inc..(Rondoni Tavernier, Anne)
November 2, 2022 Filing 7 Declaration of Amy Phillips in Support of #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Malark Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A - E, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit G)(Rondoni Tavernier, Anne)
November 2, 2022 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Malark Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Rondoni Tavernier, Anne)
November 2, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Malark Enterprises, Inc.. (Rondoni Tavernier, Anne)
November 2, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Douglas J. Malark, Malark Companies LLC. (MMG)
November 2, 2022 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per 3rd/4th Copyright, Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-2789 KMM/TNL.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMG)
November 1, 2022 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Malark Enterprises, Inc.. (Jorgenson, Jade)
November 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Douglas J. Malark, Malark Companies, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9866758) filed by Malark Enterprises, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jorgenson, Jade)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malark Enterprises, Inc. v. Malark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malark Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Jade Bailey Jorgenson
Represented By: Anne E. Rondoni Tavernier
Represented By: Joseph J Cassioppi
Represented By: Lora Mitchell Friedemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas J. Malark
Represented By: Kathy Sue Kimmel
Represented By: Natalie I. Uhlemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malark Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malark Companies LLC
Represented By: Kathy Sue Kimmel
Represented By: Natalie I. Uhlemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?