MacLeslie v. Zephyr Theatre, The et al
Plaintiff: Bil MacLeslie
Defendant: Zephyr Theatre, The doing business as Only A Dim Image Productions, Inc., Calyssa Hall, Nicole Bartelt, Robin Anthony, Alexander Eder, James Hanke, Rachael Harvey, Anissa Raleigh and Annette Sallman
Case Number: 0:2023cv00023
Filed: January 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2023 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Robin Anthony, Nicole Bartelt, Alexander Eder, Calyssa Hall, James Hanke, Rachael Harvey, Anissa Raleigh, Annette Sallman, Zephyr Theatre, The.(Sandstrom, Kevin)
March 2, 2023 Filing 18 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #15 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Robin Anthony, Nicole Bartelt, Alexander Eder, Calyssa Hall, James Hanke, Rachael Harvey, Anissa Raleigh, Annette Sallman, Zephyr Theatre, The.(Sandstrom, Kevin)
March 2, 2023 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Robin Anthony, Nicole Bartelt, Alexander Eder, Calyssa Hall, James Hanke, Rachael Harvey, Anissa Raleigh, Annette Sallman, Zephyr Theatre, The. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sandstrom, Kevin)
March 2, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Sandstrom, Kevin)
March 2, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Robin Anthony, Nicole Bartelt, Alexander Eder, Calyssa Hall, James Hanke, Rachael Harvey, Anissa Raleigh, Annette Sallman, Zephyr Theatre, The. (Sandstrom, Kevin)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text-Only) Plaintiff states in a letter filed on February 7, 2023 (Dkt. 13) that Plaintiff stipulates to an extension of time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond of March 6, 2023. Accordingly, the Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Dkt. 7) is GRANTED and the deadline extended until March 6, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/8/2023.(TMA)
February 7, 2023 Filing 13 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Bil MacLeslie regarding Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (Holstad, Devon)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. The Court finds good cause for an extension and GRANTS the motion insofar as Defendants deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (Dkt. 1) is EXTENDED until after the Court rules on Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, but no later than March 6, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/6/2023.(TMA)
February 3, 2023 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Robin Anthony, Nicole Bartelt, Alexander Eder, Calyssa Hall, James Hanke, Rachael Harvey, Anissa Raleigh, Annette Sallman, Zephyr Theatre, The.(Sandstrom, Kevin)
February 3, 2023 Filing 10 Declaration of Keith A. Marnholtz in Support of #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Robin Anthony, Nicole Bartelt, Alexander Eder, Calyssa Hall, James Hanke, Rachael Harvey, Anissa Raleigh, Annette Sallman, Zephyr Theatre, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Sandstrom, Kevin)
February 3, 2023 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Robin Anthony, Nicole Bartelt, Alexander Eder, Calyssa Hall, James Hanke, Rachael Harvey, Anissa Raleigh, Annette Sallman, Zephyr Theatre, The. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sandstrom, Kevin)
February 3, 2023 Filing 8 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Robin Anthony, Nicole Bartelt, Alexander Eder, Calyssa Hall, James Hanke, Rachael Harvey, Anissa Raleigh, Annette Sallman, Zephyr Theatre, The.(Sandstrom, Kevin)
February 3, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Robin Anthony, Nicole Bartelt, Alexander Eder, Calyssa Hall, James Hanke, Rachael Harvey, Anissa Raleigh, Annette Sallman, Zephyr Theatre, The. (Sandstrom, Kevin)
February 3, 2023 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Robin Anthony, Nicole Bartelt, Alexander Eder, Calyssa Hall, James Hanke, Rachael Harvey, Anissa Raleigh, Annette Sallman, Zephyr Theatre, The. (Sandstrom, Kevin)
February 3, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin S Sandstrom on behalf of All Defendants. (Sandstrom, Kevin)
January 26, 2023 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Bil MacLeslie. (Holstad, Devon)
January 5, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Robin Anthony, Nicole Bartelt, Alexander Eder, Calyssa Hall, James Hanke, Rachael Harvey, Anissa Raleigh, Annette Sallman, Zephyr Theatre, The. (CLK)
January 5, 2023 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 23-cv-23 ECT/ECW.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK)
January 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robin Anthony, Nicole Bartelt, Alexander Eder, Calyssa Hall, James Hanke, Rachel Harvey, Anissa Raleigh, Annette Sallman, The Zephyr Theatre, a d/b/a of Only A Dim Image Productions, Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9987013) filed by Bil MacLeslie. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Holstad, Devon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacLeslie v. Zephyr Theatre, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bil MacLeslie
Represented By: Devon Holstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zephyr Theatre, The doing business as Only A Dim Image Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Keith A. Marnholtz
Represented By: Kevin S Sandstrom
Represented By: Nicholas J Vivian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calyssa Hall
Represented By: Keith A. Marnholtz
Represented By: Kevin S Sandstrom
Represented By: Nicholas J Vivian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Bartelt
Represented By: Keith A. Marnholtz
Represented By: Kevin S Sandstrom
Represented By: Nicholas J Vivian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Anthony
Represented By: Kevin S Sandstrom
Represented By: Keith A. Marnholtz
Represented By: Nicholas J Vivian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Eder
Represented By: Kevin S Sandstrom
Represented By: Keith A. Marnholtz
Represented By: Nicholas J Vivian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hanke
Represented By: Keith A. Marnholtz
Represented By: Kevin S Sandstrom
Represented By: Nicholas J Vivian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachael Harvey
Represented By: Keith A. Marnholtz
Represented By: Kevin S Sandstrom
Represented By: Nicholas J Vivian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anissa Raleigh
Represented By: Keith A. Marnholtz
Represented By: Kevin S Sandstrom
Represented By: Nicholas J Vivian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Sallman
Represented By: Keith A. Marnholtz
Represented By: Kevin S Sandstrom
Represented By: Nicholas J Vivian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?