Lundeen et al v. Department of Housing and Urban Development et al
Plaintiff: Douglas E. Lundeen and Lori A. Lundeen
Defendant: Department of Housing and Urban Development, Bank of America, N.A. and Novad Management Consulting, LLC
Case Number: 0:2023cv00132
Filed: January 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Dulce J Foster
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Petition to Quiet Ti
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2023 Filing 18 LETTER from Wright County District Court acknowledging receipt of #16 Order of Remand. (MMP) Modified text on 3/7/2023 (MMP).
February 22, 2023 Filing 17 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Wright County District Court enclosing #16 Order of Remand. c/c: Wright County District Court. (MMP)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING CASE AND REMANDING TO STATE COURT. Signed by Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 2/21/2023.(CLG)
February 17, 2023 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank of America, N.A., Department of Housing and Urban Development re #13 Stipulation, #14 Proposed Order to Judge (Voss, Ana)
February 17, 2023 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 Stipulation,. (Voss, Ana)
February 17, 2023 Filing 13 STIPULATION by Department of Housing and Urban Development. Jointly Signed by Douglas E. Lundeen, Lori A. Lundeen, Department of Housing and Urban Development, and Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR - REFILED - #2 Proposed Order)(Voss, Ana) Modified text on 2/17/2023 (MMP).
February 15, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin T. O'Laughlin on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (O'Laughlin, Benjamin)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text-Only) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b) and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Defendant the United States Department of Housing and Urban Development's ("HUD") Second Request For Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (ECF No. #9 ). Defendant HUD shall have up to and including February 21, 2023 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. [1-1]). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 2/14/2023. (MEH)
February 13, 2023 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re 2nd Request for Enlargement of Time #9 Request. (Voss, Ana)
February 13, 2023 Filing 9 REQUEST 2nd - for enlargement of time to answer or otherwise respond by Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Voss, Ana)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text-Only) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b) and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Defendant the United States Department of Housing and Urban Development's ("HUD") Unopposed Request For Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (ECF No. #5 ). Defendant HUD shall have up to and including February 13, 2023 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (ECF No. [1-1]). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 1/23/2023. (MEH)
January 23, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Housing and Urban Development re #5 Request, #6 Proposed Order to Judge - Other (Voss, Ana)
January 23, 2023 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Request. (Voss, Ana)
January 23, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST For Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Voss, Ana)
January 18, 2023 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Matthew B. Brown as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. cc: Matthew B. Brown. (ACH)
January 18, 2023 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Please use case number 23-cv-0132 PJS/DJF.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
January 17, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Secretary of Housing and Urban Development re #1 Notice of Removal, (Voss, Ana)
January 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tenth Judicial District Wright County Minnesota, case number 86-CV-22-503 filed by Secretary of Housing and Urban Development. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Voss, Ana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundeen et al v. Department of Housing and Urban Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas E. Lundeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori A. Lundeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Benjamin T. O'Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novad Management Consulting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?