Wolf et al v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Eliyahu Wolf and Miranda Phelps
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Case Number: 0:2023cv00145
Filed: January 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
2 Judge: Dulce J Foster
3 Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois for all further proceedings. Judge John R. Tunheim, Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 23-cv-00145 NEB/LIB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Judge John R. Tunheim on 3/9/2023.(MTB)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephanie S. McGraw for American Honda Motor Co., Inc. Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 3/3/2023. (KMO)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael L. Mallow for American Honda Motor Co., Inc. Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 3/3/2023. (KMO)
March 7, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE by Miranda Phelps, Eliyahu Wolf of Related Action (Lindenfeld, Jonathan)
February 28, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephanie McGraw. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10103816 filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Ackley, John)
February 28, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael L. Mallow. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10103743 filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Ackley, John)
February 9, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Ackley, John)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Elizabeth Fegan for Miranda Phelps and Eliyahu Wolf; granting #28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan David Lindenfeld for Miranda Phelps and Eliyahu Wolf. Approved by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 2/1/2023. (KMO)
January 31, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan D. Lindenfeld. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10044011 filed by Miranda Phelps, Eliyahu Wolf. (Wang, Ling)
January 31, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth A. Fegan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10043960 filed by Miranda Phelps, Eliyahu Wolf. (Wang, Ling)
January 27, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Ling Shan Wang on behalf of Miranda Phelps, Eliyahu Wolf. (Wang, Ling)
January 19, 2023 Filing 25 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Elisabeth Fegan, Jonathan Lindenfeld, Michael Mallow, Stephanie McGraw, Amy Yongmee Cho as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt) cc Elisabeth Fegan, Jonathan Lindenfeld, Michael Mallow, Stephanie McGraw, Amy Yongmee Cho. (kt)
January 19, 2023 Filing 24 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:22-cv-05855. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim and referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster per 3rd/4th Master List.
January 18, 2023 Filing 23 TRANSFERRED to the USDC District of Minnesota the electronic record. (jg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
January 17, 2023 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The Agreed Motion for Transfer #21 is granted and this case is ordered transferred to the District of Minnesota forthwith. Defendant's Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint or, alternatively, motion to transfer, dismiss or stay #14 is terminated as moot without prejudice to defendant filing a motion to dismiss in the Minnesota District Court. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cn). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
January 17, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miranda Phelps, Eliyahu Wolf to transfer case and for Extension of Time (Agreed) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fegan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
January 4, 2023 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion To Withdraw Brooke A. Achua Of Fegan Scott LLC As Counsel Of Record for plaintiffs #19 is granted. Mailed notice (cn). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
January 4, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miranda Phelps, Eliyahu Wolf to withdraw Brooke A. Achua of Fegan Scott LLC as Counsel of Record (Fegan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Filing 18 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
December 12, 2022 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Attorney Stephanie S. McGraw's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #16 on behalf of defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. is granted. Mailed notice (cn). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
December 12, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20130368. (McGraw, Stephanie) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
December 10, 2022 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint Or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer, Dismiss, Or Stay #24 : plaintiffs' response due 1/16/2023; defendant's reply due 2/6/2023. The court will issue its ruling via CM/ECF. Mailed notice (cn). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
December 9, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. to dismiss Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer, Dismiss, or Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mackie Complaint)(Mallow, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
November 16, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time #11 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading due by 12/9/2022. Mailed notice (cn). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
November 15, 2022 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. by Michael L. Mallow (Mallow, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
November 15, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. for extension of time to file answer Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
November 15, 2022 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
November 15, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. by Amy Yongmee Cho (Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
November 1, 2022 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Attorney Brooke A. Achua's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #7 on behalf of plaintiffs Eliyahu Wolf and Miranda Phelps is granted Mailed notice (cn). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
November 1, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19999842. (Achua, Brooke) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
November 1, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Attorney Jonathan D. Lindenfeld's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #5 on behalf of plaintiffs Eliyahu Wolf and Miranda Phelps is granted. Mailed notice (cn). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
November 1, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19999820. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
October 31, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eliyahu Wolf, Miranda Phelps as to American Honda Motor Co., Inc. on 10/28/2022, answer due 11/18/2022. (Fegan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Miranda Phelps, Eliyahu Wolf by Elizabeth A. Fegan (Fegan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fegan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Eliyahu Wolf, Miranda Phelps; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19975948.(Fegan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
October 24, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jk2, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
October 24, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jk2, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]
October 24, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (dxb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolf et al v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliyahu Wolf
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Represented By: Jonathan David Lindenfeld
Represented By: Ling Shan Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miranda Phelps
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Represented By: Jonathan David Lindenfeld
Represented By: Ling Shan Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: John Lawrence Ackley
Represented By: Michael L. Mallow
Represented By: Stephanie S. McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?