Okash v. Essentia Health
Plaintiff: Michael Okash
Defendant: Essentia Health
Case Number: 0:2023cv00482
Filed: February 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2510 Wire or Oral Communications
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Michael Okash . (Gudmundson, Brian)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 LETTER to Request Scheduling of a Hearing on #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Failure to State a Claim in person at the Duluth courthouse at a time mutually convenient for the Court and the parties. (Justman, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE by Michael Okash of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Declaration of Pam Marlatt in Support of #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Failure to State a Claim filed by Essentia Health.(Justman, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY re #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Failure to State a Claim filed by Essentia Health. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Justman, Jeffrey)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DECLARATION of Brian C. Gudmundson in Opposition to #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael Okash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Gudmundson, Brian)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael Okash. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gudmundson, Brian)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Failure to State a Claim filed by Essentia Health.(Justman, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #23 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Essentia Health. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Correspondence, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Correspondence)(Justman, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Declaration of Jeffrey P. Justman in Support of #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Failure to State a Claim filed by Essentia Health. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - True and Correct Copy of Essentia Health's Website Privacy Policy & Terms of Use, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Redline of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint)(Justman, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Essentia Health. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Justman, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Failure to State a Claim : Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Date and time to be determined. (Justman, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Failure to State a Claim filed by Essentia Health. (Justman, Jeffrey)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #21 Letter to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits. Permission granted. The parties may use up to 14,000 words to brief the forthcoming motion to dismiss. Ordered by Judge John R. Tunheim on 6/22/2023.(HMA)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits . (Justman, Jeffrey)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Andy Taylor on behalf of Essentia Health. (Taylor, Andy)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (Text-Only) ORDER approving #17 Stipulation re: Briefing Schedule. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is due on or before 6/23/2023. Responses due by 7/28/2023. Replies due by 8/23/2023. Ordered by Judge John R. Tunheim on 5/31/2023.(HMA)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 Stipulation. (Justman, Jeffrey)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION re Briefing Schedule by Essentia Health. Jointly Signed by Michael Okash, and and on behalf of those similarly situated,. (Justman, Jeffrey)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Anderson Tuggle on behalf of Essentia Health. (Tuggle, Anderson)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Essentia Health. filed by Michael Okash. No summons requested. (Gudmundson, Brian)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Zoe K Wilhelm for Essentia Health. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/28/2023. (KMO)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Justin O'Neill Kay for Essentia Health. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/23/2023. (KMO)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #7 Stipulation. Essentia Health answer due 5/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/17/2023.(JLB)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Essentia Health. (Justman, Jeffrey)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justin O. Kay. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10139755 filed by Essentia Health. (Justman, Jeffrey)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Zoe K. Wilhelm. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10139689 filed by Essentia Health. (Justman, Jeffrey)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Justman, Jeffrey)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Defendant's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Essentia Health. Jointly Signed by Michael Okash. (Justman, Jeffrey)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P Justman on behalf of Essentia Health. (Justman, Jeffrey)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Okash. Essentia Health served on 3/2/2023, answer due 3/23/2023. (Gudmundson, Brian)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENTRY FILED IN ERROR//(Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Hart L. Robinovitch as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (ACH) Modified text on 3/1/2023 (ACH).
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Essentia Health. (ACH)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (5th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 23-cv-0482 JRT/LIB.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Essentia Health (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10104644) filed by Michael Okash. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gudmundson, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Okash v. Essentia Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Okash
Represented By: Brian C Gudmundson
Represented By: Anne T Regan
Represented By: Anthony Stauber
Represented By: David A Goodwin
Represented By: Rachel Kristine Tack
Represented By: Michael J Laird
Represented By: Nathan D Prosser
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Represented By: Hart L Robinovitch
Represented By: Jason P Johnston
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essentia Health
Represented By: Jeffrey P Justman
Represented By: Justin O'Neill Kay
Represented By: Zoe K Wilhelm
Represented By: Anderson Tuggle
Represented By: Andy Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?