Truong v. Collins Aerospace System et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Truong
Defendant: Collins Aerospace System, Seyfarth & Shaw LLP., Rosemount Aerospace Inc dba UTC Aerospace Systems and Rosemount Aerospace Inc doing business as UTC Aerospace Systems
Case Number: 0:2023cv01346
Filed: May 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Micko
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY regarding Dispositive Motions briefing schedule: All dispositive motions must comply with Local Rule 7.1(c). Responses to dispositive motions shall be filed with the Court on or before 21 days after the service of the supporting memorandum to the original motion. Replies to responsive briefs shall be filed 14 days after the service of the response to the dispositive motion. Upon the motion being fully briefed and filed, counsel for the moving party shall email Chief Judge Tunheims chambers at Tunheim_Chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov to request a hearing date. Upon receiving from Chief Judge Tunheims Courtroom Deputy a hearing date, time and location, the moving party shall file the amended notice of hearing at that time. Responses due by 7/17/2023. Replies due by 7/31/2023. (HMA) Modified text on 7/10/2023 (HMA).
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason M Torres for Collins Aerospace System, Rosemount Aerospace Inc, and Seyfarth & Shaw LLP. Approved by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 7/10/2023. (jam)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason M. Torres. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10391090 filed by Collins Aerospace System, Rosemount Aerospace Inc, Seyfarth & Shaw LLP.. (Orozco, Pablo)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by Lisa Truong. (ABR)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa Truong (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Movant)(ABR)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text-Only) ORDER: Due to the pending Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 8), the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. The Court will schedule a pretrial conference, if needed, promptly after a decision is issued on the pending motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 6/27/2023. (jme)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Jason M. Torres as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Orozco, Pablo)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #8 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Collins Aerospace System, Rosemount Aerospace Inc, Seyfarth & Shaw LLP..(Orozco, Pablo)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EXHIBIT List re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #9 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Collins Aerospace System, Rosemount Aerospace Inc, Seyfarth & Shaw LLP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3)(Orozco, Pablo)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Collins Aerospace System, Rosemount Aerospace Inc, Seyfarth & Shaw LLP.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Orozco, Pablo)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Collins Aerospace System, Rosemount Aerospace Inc, Seyfarth & Shaw LLP.. (Orozco, Pablo)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Pablo Orozco on behalf of All Defendants. (Orozco, Pablo)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Lisa Truong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(ABR)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO ANSWER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 6/14/2023.(jme)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Truong. Collins Aerospace System served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/12/2023; Rosemount Aerospace Inc served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/12/2023; Seyfarth & Shaw LLP. served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/12/2023. (ABR)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Collins Aerospace System, Rosemount Aerospace Inc dba UTC Aerospace Systems, Seyfarth & Shaw LLP. cc: Lisa Truong w/ Information Sheet #2 (jam) Modified text on 5/17/2023 (jam).
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILED IN ERROR: Summons Issued as to Collins Aerospace System, Rosemount Aerospace Inc dba UTC Aerospace Systems, Seyfarth & Shaw LLP. (jam) Modified text on 5/15/2023 (jam).
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Collins Aerospace System, Rosemount Aerospace Inc dba UTC Aerospace Systems, Seyfarth & Shaw LLP. (filing fee $402, receipt number 4-2359) filed by Lisa Truong. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. (Attachments: #1 Addendum, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truong v. Collins Aerospace System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collins Aerospace System
Represented By: Jason M Torres
Represented By: Pablo Orozco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seyfarth & Shaw LLP.
Represented By: Pablo Orozco
Represented By: Jason M Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemount Aerospace Inc dba UTC Aerospace Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemount Aerospace Inc doing business as UTC Aerospace Systems
Represented By: Jason M Torres
Represented By: Pablo Orozco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?