Northern Natural Gas Co. v. Easement and Right-of-Way Across 33.523 acres more or less, located in Lot 1, Block 1 Steeple View 2d Addition, Scott County, Minnesota et al
Plaintiff: Northern Natural Gas Co.
Defendant: Easement and Right-of-Way Across 33.523 acres more or less, located in Lot 1, Block 1 Steeple View 2d Addition, Scott County, Minnesota, Aaron Le, Lan Le and Barney Financial, LLC
Case Number: 0:2023cv01906
Filed: June 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Micko
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 717 Natural Gas Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northern Natural Gas Co.. Barney Financial, LLC served on 8/10/2023, answer due 8/31/2023. (Driscoll, Devin)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Northern Natural Gas Co. . (Driscoll, Devin)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(CLK)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF LAW GRANTING #6 PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 8/2/2023. (KKM)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northern Natural Gas Co.. Lan Le served on 6/23/2023, answer due 7/14/2023. (Driscoll, Devin)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northern Natural Gas Co.. Barney Financial, LLC served on 6/26/2023, answer due 7/17/2023. (Driscoll, Devin)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Northern Natural Gas Co. re #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #1 Complaint, #6 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Use and Possession, #10 Proposed Order to Judge, #4 Summons Issued, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #8 Declaration in Support, #5 Notice (Other), #9 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Driscoll, Devin)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Use and Possession filed by Northern Natural Gas Co..(Driscoll, Devin)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Use and Possession : Date and time to be determined. (Driscoll, Devin)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Declaration of Bryan P. Kruger in Support of #6 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Use and Possession filed by Northern Natural Gas Co..(Driscoll, Devin)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Use and Possession filed by Northern Natural Gas Co.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Driscoll, Devin)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Use and Possession filed by Northern Natural Gas Co.. (Driscoll, Devin)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE by Northern Natural Gas Co. of Condemnation (Driscoll, Devin)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Barney Financial, LLC, Easement and Right-of-Way Across 33.523 acres more or less, located in Lot 1, Block 1 Steeple View 2d Addition, Scott County, Minnesota, Aaron Le, Lan Le. (ABR)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. Please use case number 23-cv-1906 (JRT/DLM).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Northern Natural Gas Co.. (Driscoll, Devin)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barney Financial, LLC, Easement and Right-of-Way Across 33.523 acres more or less, located in Lot 1, Block 1 Steeple View 2d Addition, Scott County, Minnesota, Aaron Le, Lan Le (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10365326) filed by Northern Natural Gas Co.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summary of Easement Area, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Driscoll, Devin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern Natural Gas Co. v. Easement and Right-of-Way Across 33.523 acres more or less, located in Lot 1, Block 1 Steeple View 2d Addition, Scott County, Minnesota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Natural Gas Co.
Represented By: Howard A Roston
Represented By: Patrick D J Mahlberg
Represented By: Devin Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easement and Right-of-Way Across 33.523 acres more or less, located in Lot 1, Block 1 Steeple View 2d Addition, Scott County, Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lan Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barney Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?